This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 14:20:38 (UTC).

KAMALDEEP SINGH vs. SANDEEP SEHGAL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 KAMALDEEP SINGH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANDEEP SEHGAL. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Snauffer, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Simpson, Alan, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0691

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Simpson, Alan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff

SINGH, KAMALDEEP

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SEHGAL, SANDEEP

SEHGAL, GURDEB

ROYALTY FREIGHT, INC.

GREWAL, NEHA

H&H EXPRESS

SEHGAL, SUNNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Makasian, James

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Campagne, Justin T.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: COMPLAINT-BREACH OF CONTRACT

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: 1st Amended Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint filed

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation Regarding Alternative Disputer Resolution (ADR); Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Howard Broadman

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: SUMMONS

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: SUMMONS

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: H&H EXPRESS; GREWAL, NEHA; SEHGAL, GURDEB; SEHGAL, SUNNY; Comment: Without Prejudice

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Summons issued and filed

First Amended Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

Summons issued and filed

First Amended Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: General Denial

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: H&H EXPRESS; GREWAL, NEHA; SEHGAL, GURDEB; SEHGAL, SUNNY; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by Plaintiff with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Trial continued to: 8/10/20 at 9:00am in dept. 502 TRR continued to 8/7/20 at 9:30am in dept. 502 MSC continued to 7/22/20 at 10:00am in dept. 575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Stipulation and Order; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order for: Stipulation and order to continue trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Proof of Service; Comment: Proposed Order (Cover Sheet)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • Financial info for SEHGAL, SANDEEP: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-03966 SEHGAL, SANDEEP $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Financial info for SEHGAL, SANDEEP: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Financial: SEHGAL, SANDEEP; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Financial info for SINGH, KAMALDEEP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-51222 SINGH, KAMALDEEP $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Financial info for SINGH, KAMALDEEP: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for SINGH, KAMALDEEP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-42862 SINGH, KAMALDEEP $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for SINGH, KAMALDEEP: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for SINGH, KAMALDEEP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-11481 SINGH, KAMALDEEP $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for SINGH, KAMALDEEP: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial: SINGH, KAMALDEEP; Total Financial Assessment $555.00; Total Payments and Credits $555.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.