This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:24:22 (UTC).

Justin Bradshaw vs Martin Ayala/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Justin Bradshaw filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Martin Ayala/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3845

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradshaw, Justin

Defendants

Ayala, Martin

T&T Trucking Inc, a Calif. Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

English, Monrae L.

Wild, Carter & Tipton 246 W. Shaw Avenue

Fresno, CA 93704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued OSC; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:01 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for OSC scheduled for 6/26/14. Case dismissed on 4/18/14 rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 4-21-14. Dismissed gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. gar Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE185117.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Bradshaw, Justin: Counter Payment Receipt # 185117 Bradshaw, Justin $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Bradshaw, Justin: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Bradshaw, Justin; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less