This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:17:02 (UTC).

Jury Commissioner vs Ramon Salazar

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Jury Commissioner filed an Other lawsuit against Ramon Salazar. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Conklin, Jonathan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3839

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Conklin, Jonathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fresno County Jury Commissioner

Defendants

Venezuela, James Perez

Shields, Amy Viola

Tapscott, Stephen King

Valencia, Luis Alberto

Saldivar, Rico Guy

Saphieh, Odeh Fareed

Torres, Karla Christina

Villegas, Meagan E

Salazar, Ramon Luis

Villanueva, Richard Luis, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2014
  • Juror resolves after hearing- Comment: Juror resolved after hearing. Fee for service paid or not imposed. Juror completes service or is excused/disqualified, action is dismissed. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Juror appear/fee paid/serves- Comment: Juror appears at OSC hearing, Sheriff service recovery fee paid - new date for jury service scheduled. Juror completes service, action is dismissed. 3/10/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Juror resolves after hearing- Comment: Juror resolved after hearing. Fee for service paid or not imposed. Juror completes service or is excused/disqualified, action is dismissed. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Contempt- Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Juror OSC resolved - new date- Comment: Juror OSC resolved prior to hearing; Sheriff service recovery fee paid. Juror completes service, action is dismissed. 1/30/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Attempted service of juror OSC- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Attempted service of juror OSC- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Attempted service of juror OSC- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Juror unserved - excused/disq- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar, action is dismissed. 1/30/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Proof of service of juror OSC- Comment: Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on Luis Alberto Valencia by personal delivery. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less