Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:55 (UTC).

Jury Commissioner vs Eduardo Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Jury Commissioner filed an Other lawsuit against Eduardo Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Conklin, Jonathan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3838

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Conklin, Jonathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fresno County Jury Commissioner

Defendants

Gonzalez, Eduardo A

Hix, Robert Alan

Listman, Phillip Nathan

Hue, Pha

Rodriguez, Celeste

Rodriguez, Sandra Reyes

Nicholas, Richard Michael

Osornio, Sulema Patty

Leon, Brenda Sarah

Keppler, Jonthomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2014
  • Juror appears/fee paid/excused- Comment: Juror appears at OSC hearing, Sheriff service recovery fee paid, juror excused/disqualified, action is dismissed. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Contempt- Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Juror unserved - excused/disq- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar, action is dismissed. 1/29/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Attempted service of juror OSC- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Attempted service of juror OSC- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Attempted service of juror OSC- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Juror unserved - excused/disq- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar, action is dismissed. 01/07/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Juror unserved - excused/disq- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar, action is dismissed. 01/07/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Juror unserved - excused/disq- Comment: Service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt attempted but service not completed - juror had moved. Hearing off calendar, action is dismissed. 01/02/2014 ac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Proof of service of juror OSC- Comment: Proof of service of affidavit and OSC re: juror contempt served on Eduardo A Gonzalez by personal delivery. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Complaint filed- Comment: Order to show cause re: contempt by juror signed by Judge J Conklin filed. Hearing set on February 4, 2014 at 8:30 am in dept. 72. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Affidavit for juror contempt- Comment: Affidavit re contempt by juror for issuance of OSC filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less