This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 05:16:37 (UTC).

Julian Salazar vs. Theodore Aceves

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 Julian Salazar filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Theodore Aceves. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3015

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salazar, Julian

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Aceves, Theodore

California-Nevada Annual Conference of the United Methodist Church

House of Grace

DOE 1

Doe 4

Doe 2

Grace Methodist Church of Fresno, California

Grace United Methodist Church

Defendants and Cross Defendants

House of Grace

California-Nevada Annula Conference of The United Methodist Church

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Medby, David M

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

DeMaria, Anthony N.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Ntc.WD.MTQ.SDT.pdf; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Req.Pretrial.Disc.Conference.FI.pdf; Comment: Forwarded to dept. 402

Statement filed

Sep.Stmt.MTQ.SDT.MedRecords.pdf; Comment: Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Quash

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Motion filed

MTC.PMK.Depo.pdf; Comment: Motion to Compel PMK Deposition

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Statement filed

Defendants Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts I; Comment: Defendants Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Daniel L Wainwright; Comment: Declaration of Daniel L Wainwright

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Statement filed

Sep.Stmt.MTC.PMK.Depo.CA.NV.pdf; Comment: Separate Statement

Amendment filed

Doe.Amendment.02.pdf; Comment: Document: Addiing Grace United Methodist Church as Doe 2 as to Original Complaint.

Notice Filed

Ntc.WD.Req.PreTrial.Conf.pdf; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Request for PreTrial Conf

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of defendants

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Fax letter from McCormick Barstow regarding Request for pretrial discovery conference

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes.

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Daniel Wainwright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Motion - Compel- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: Daniel Wainwright Further responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed- Reply; Comment: to Non Opposition to defendants discovery motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Motion - Quash- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Opposition to Request a Pretrial Discovery Conference re: Pl; Comment: Frowarded to dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial: California-Nevada Annual Conference of the United Methodist Church; Total Financial Assessment $1,735.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-71802 Salazar, Julian $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-69545 Salazar, Julian $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-17315 Salazar, Julian $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-41438 Salazar, Julian $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Salazar, Julian: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial: Salazar, Julian; Total Financial Assessment $705.00; Total Payments and Credits $705.00

    Read MoreRead Less