This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 17:49:19 (UTC).

Juan Zavala vs. Lidia Herrera

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 Juan Zavala filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Lidia Herrera. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1383

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zavala, Juan Carlos

Defendant

Herrera, Lidia Murillo

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Zavala, Juan Carlos; Awarded Against:; Herrera, Lidia Murillo; Amount; Damages: $600.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $670.00; Status: Granted; Status Date: 08/04/2016; Status Comment: $30.00 to be paid back to court /$40.00 to FSO waived fees; Party Name: Zavala, Juan Carlos

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor or Third Person filed.

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: by deputy clerk

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Zavala, Juan Carlos; Awarded Against:; Herrera, Lidia Murillo; Amount; Damages: $600.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $670.00; Status: Granted; Status Date: 08/04/2016; Status Comment: $30.00 to be paid back to court /$40.00 to FSO waived fees; Party Name: Zavala, Juan Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Other- Comment: OX-Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Examination- Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor or Third Person filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Examination- Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00004583 Zavala, Juan Carlos $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00035804 Zavala, Juan Carlos $4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Fee Waiver $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Transaction Assessment $64.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00022006 Zavala, Juan Carlos $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Transaction Assessment $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Fee Waiver $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial info for Zavala, Juan Carlos: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial: Zavala, Juan Carlos; Total Financial Assessment $217.50; Total Payments and Credits $217.50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.