This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:48 (UTC).

Juan C Puentes vs Mike Kelly

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Juan C Puentes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mike Kelly. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3835

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Puentes, Juan Chico

Defendants

Kelly, Mike

Kelly, Cindy Crawford

Kelly's Beach

Harold, Donald Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gilmore, Robert G.

The Atrium 1111 E. Herndon,Ste. 204

Fresno, CA 93720

Defendant Attorney

Hager, Paul R.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs filed

Civil Document; Comment: Total Costs: $ 19,618.63

Motion in Limine filed

Motion in Limine filed; Comment: 4- for DEFT Donald Steven Harold

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of intent to play portions of videotaped deposition of Donald Steven Harold at trial

Objection filed

Objection filed; Comment: for Defendants to Plaintiff's amended Notice of Intent to Play Portions of Vedeotaped Deposition of Cindy Crawford Kelly at Trial

Notice Filed

Civil Document; Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Intent to play portions of videotaped deposition of Mike Kelly at trial

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Day 2

Amendment filed

Amendment filed; Comment: Plaintiff's amended Witness List

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Michael Renberg New Attorney: Paul Hager

Objection filed

Objection filed; Comment: Deft's Objection to plaintiff's Second amended Notice of Intent to Play Portions of videotaped deposition of Donal Steven Harold

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Pltf's Third Notice of Lodging Certified Originals of Depostition Transcripts for Trial

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: 2nd Amended Notice Intent to Play Protions of Videotaped Deposition of Donald Steven Harold at Trial

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: for Jury Instructions on Behalf of Defendants Mike Kelly, Cindy Crawford Kelly and kelly's Beach

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Only as to Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action-Intentional Tort

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: court reporter, Myra Pish

Motion in Limine filed

Motion in Limine filed; Comment: 6- Kelly Defendants' for An Order Excluding Witnesses From Attending Trial During Testimony of Other Witnesses

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Day 5

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment on Jury Verdict; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Judgment on Jury Verdict; Party Names: Puentes, Juan Chico; Kelly, Mike; Kelly, Cindy Crawford; Kelly's Beach; Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Harold, Donald Steven; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Kelly, Mike; Kelly, Cindy Crawford; Awarded Against:; Puentes, Juan Chico; Status: Granted; Status Date: 09/15/2015; Status Comment: Action to be dismissed, costs in the amount TBD and interest at 10% beginning on 9/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Re Plaintiff's Right to Appeal and Defendants' Recovery of Costs on Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 402 Order for: plaintiff's right to appeal and defendants' recovery of costs on judgment, signed and issued. FF to clerk's office 10/20/2015, for further processing. mgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs filed- Civil Document; Comment: Total Costs: $ 19,618.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Jury Fees Collected- Civil Document; Comment: in the amount of $282.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forward to: 402, signed and issued. FF to clerks office 09/15/2015, for further processing. mgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Day 7

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2014
  • Financial info for Kelly, Mike: Counter Payment Receipt # 189110 Kelly, Mike $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Financial info for Kelly, Mike: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Financial info for Kelly, Mike: Counter Payment Receipt # 187086 Kelly, Mike $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Financial info for Kelly, Mike: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Financial: Kelly, Mike; Total Financial Assessment $887.36; Total Payments and Credits $887.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Financial info for Puentes, Juan Chico: Counter Payment Receipt # 189338 Puentes, Juan Chico $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Financial info for Puentes, Juan Chico: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Puentes, Juan Chico: Counter Payment Receipt # 185097 Puentes, Juan Chico $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Puentes, Juan Chico: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Puentes, Juan Chico; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less