This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/12/2022 at 16:46:33 (UTC).

Jose Gonzalez vs Harris Ranch Beef/REMOVED

Case Summary

On 12/04/2013 Jose Gonzalez filed an Other lawsuit against Harris Ranch Beef/REMOVED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark W and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3747

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark W

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Jose

Defendants

Harris Ranch Beef Company, a Calif Corp

Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company, a Calif Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaines, Daniel F.

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 980 Gaines & Gaines

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketOff calendar; Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 4-7-14. Removed gar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Notice of Removal of Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action; Comment: Notice of removal of jurisdiction over action to federal court filed. dhouston

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Michael J Casey agent for service on 12/11/13. dhouston

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Michael J Casey agent for service on 12/11/13. dhouston

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DocketProof of service filed; Comment: Proof of service of notice of assignment of judge filed. Served on attached service list by mail on 12/16/13. dhouston

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company on 12/11/2013. . le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Harris Ranch Beef Company, a Calif Corp on 12/11/2013 . le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketNotice Assignment of Judge; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 12-DEC-2013 by SAMGARCIA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketPursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Comment: Judge Black disqualified pursuant to CCP 170.6. sg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gonzalez, Jose: Counter Payment Receipt # 184731 Gonzalez, Jose $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gonzalez, Jose: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • FinancialFinancial: Gonzalez, Jose; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 04-DEC-2013 by LESPARZA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE184731.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less