This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 00:47:00 (UTC).

Jose Cruz vs. 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2016 Jose Cruz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L P. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2567

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cruz, Jose M

Defendants and Cross Defendants

D & K Management Inc.

Casa De Rosas Apartments

Marin, Leah

81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.

Marin, Lea

D&K Management Inc.

Cross Plaintiffs

Transunion Interactive, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Online Information Services, Inc.

Equifax, Inc.

Cross Defendants

D&K Management, Inc.

81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.

Marin, Lea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ruppel, Rosalinda A.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Zimmer, Jeanne L.

 

Court Documents

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Declaration Filed

Decl of Henderson ISO Ex Parte Application.pdf; Comment: DECLARATION OF STACY L. HENDERSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS??? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Motion

Motion; Comment: and Motion for: Judgment on The Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof

Declaration Filed

Decl ISO Ex Parte App. - File X-Com.pdf; Comment: DECLARATION OF ROSALINDA A. RUPPEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS??? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANTS??? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of MPA on Grace Felipe

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Returned to clerk's office unsigned with a note attached. All counsel need to sign. Forwarded to 502 Stipulation Extending Time for Cross-Defendants, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Trans Union, Llc, and Transunion Interactive, Inc., to Answer or otherwise Respond to Cross-Complaint and Order

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Partial Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Transunion Interactive, Inc.

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Partial Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Equifax, Inc.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Experian Information Services, Inc.

Order Received for Signature

[Proposed] Order Shortening Time - X-Complaint.pdf; Comment: [PROPOSED] ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANTS??? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Rosalinda A. Ruppel

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Cross-complaint; Online Information

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation; Comment: signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to Dept:502 on 3/8/18 Order for: stipulated protective order

Order Received for Signature

[Proposed] Order to Continue Trial.pdf; Comment: [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Motion filed

Motion; Comment: Notice of Demurrer

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Transunion Interactive, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Trans Union, LLC; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Equifax, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 1-5 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration; Comment: stipulated protective order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Stipulation; Comment: signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to Dept:502 on 3/8/18 Order for: stipulated protective order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial info for 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-08157 81 Casa De Rosas Apartments, L.P. $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial info for 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.: Transaction Assessment $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54201 Casa De Rosas Apartments $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05112 Casa; De; Rosas; Apartments $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Financial info for 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Financial: 81 Casa De Rosa Apartments, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment $655.00; Total Payments and Credits $655.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Cruz, Jose M: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Cruz, Jose M: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial: Cruz, Jose M; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.