This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 10:55:12 (UTC).

John Sobaje vs Casabianca/UD/JUDGMENT

Case Summary

On 02/08/2012 John Sobaje filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Casabianca/UD/JUDGMENT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0160

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sobaje, John

Sobaje, Kristen

Defendant

Casabianca, John

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Altounian, Gregory L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Money damages after 1169- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge John Gallagher on 5/30/12 judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of John Sobaje and Kristen Sobaje against John Casabiance in the sum of: Past Due Rent: $1,325.00 Holdover Damages: $927.49 Atty Fees: $0.00 Costs: $486.00 Total: $2,738.49 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Minute order Judge Gallagher- Comment: Dept. Clovis Judge: John J. Gallagher Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 11/40/30 Hearing: Money Damages Appearing Party: Plaintiff's Counsel: Gregory L. Altounian Attorney Gregory L. Altounian is sworn and testifies. Court takes judicial notice of the rental agreement, 3 day notice and proof of service in the file. Order signed. Notice waived. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 30-MAY-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:03 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • Writ filed wholly satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL38239.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) John Sobaje and Kristen Sobaje against defendant(s) John Casabianca on 3-8-12 for restitution of the premises only. 2365 Fallbrook Avenue Clovis, CA 93611 Fresno County lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to John Casabianca. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2012
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Please check item #1 (b) for spelling of Plaintiff's name. Judgment not entered as requested. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Filed proof service by mail- Comment: Copies of the Summons and Complaint on UD were placed in a sealed envelope and mailed to all unknown occupants in possession on 2/15/12 with prepaid postage certified mail in the United States Mail. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • POS of summons & comp posted- Comment: Proof of service of summons and unlawful detainer complaint filed showing service on all unknown occupants in possession by posting on 2/15/12. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCL37997.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for service of Summons by Posting signed by Judge Gregory T Fain. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL37948.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 cr Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet cr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less