This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 17:15:08 (UTC).

John Sobaje v Gary Kooiman udd

Case Summary

On 03/18/2010 John Sobaje filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gary Kooiman udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0377

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sobaje, Gary

Defendant

Kooiman, Gary

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Altounian, Gregory L.

Defendant Attorney

Kooiman, Gary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2010
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Stipulation- Comment: Stipulated Judgment: Plaintiff is awarded possession of the premises located at 4707 East Shepard Avenue, Clovis, CA 93619. A writ of possession will issue immediately and include any and all occupants, but there will be no lockout before 04/29/10 at 12:00am (midnight). Principal: $3,100.00; Holdover Damages: $800.00; Costs: $450.00; Attorney Fees: $750.00; Total Amount Owed: $5,100.00. Defendant waives the right to extend the Sheriff's lockout date based on hardship or for any other reason. Order signed in open court. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clov Clerk: V. Salazar Reporter: 11:08:21 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL29754.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only, stayed to 04-29-10 @12am cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 22-APR-2010 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 04/28/10. set for trial. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial on 04/22/10 at 11:00am in dept #1. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. cm Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCL29419.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for Service of Summons by Posting / Publication signed by Judge Fain on 03/23/10 .cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$220.00 was made on receipt CLCL29391.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 19-MAR-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 19-MAR-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.