This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 19:28:34 (UTC).

John Osburn, SR vs.Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Case Summary

On 06/29/2016 John Osburn, SR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Snauffer, Mark, Black, Donald and Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2068

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Snauffer, Mark

Black, Donald

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Osburn, John, JR

Osburn, John, SR

Osburn, Shanda

Osburn, Devlin

Surviving Biological children of Decedent, Margaret Osburn

surviving husband of Decedent, Margaret Osburn

Defendants

Macias, Fernando, Medical Doctor

Conti, Jennifer, Medical Doctor

Fresno Community Hospital dba Community Regional Medical Center

K.W.P.H. Enterprises dba American Ambulance

Community Regional Medical Center

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moeck, David M.

Defendant Attorneys

Jones, Jerry D.

Offenhauser, Tyler D

Ray, Karen J.

 

Court Documents

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: Statement of Evidence in Support of Motion for SJ

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: continue Summary Judgment Motion

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Opposition

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office 11/1/17 for further processing Forward (on 10/31/2017) to: 502

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Declaration Filed

Exhibit A2 to Ms. Leaf's Dec; Comment: Exhibit A2 to Ms. Leaf's Dec

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Fresno Community Hospital DBA CRMC

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Opposition

Notice of Motion

Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication; Comment: and motion for: Summary judgment

Declaration Filed

Exhibit A5 to Ms. Leaf's Dec; Comment: Exhibit A5 to Ms. Leaf's Dec

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of David M. Moeck in support of stip and roder to vacate trial date

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Dr. Bresler; Comment: Declaration of Dr. Bresler

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAVID M. MOECK IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Macias, Fernando, Medical Doctor; Awarded Against:; Osburn, John, SR; Osburn, John, JR; Osburn, Shanda; Osburn, Devlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Conti, Jennifer, Medical Doctor; Awarded Against:; Osburn, John, SR; Osburn, John, JR; Osburn, Shanda; Osburn, Devlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Karen Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 7-10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's certificate of mailing attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Trial Setting Conference- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-38961 Fresno Community Hospital dba Community Regional Medical Center $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $1,085.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Financial info for Osburn, John, SR: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-06529 Osburn, John $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Financial info for Osburn, John, SR: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Financial info for Osburn, John, SR: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-43433 Osburn, John $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Financial info for Osburn, John, SR: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Financial info for Osburn, John, SR: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00023579 Quinlan $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Financial info for Osburn, John, SR: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Financial: Osburn, John, SR; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.