This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 00:55:13 (UTC).

John Garza vs. Farmers Ins. Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2014 John Garza filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Farmers Ins Company, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Dalesandro, Samuel, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3688

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garza, John

Garza, Maryann

Defendants

Farners Insurance Company, Inc.

Fire Insurance Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ramirez Jr., Edward R.

Ramirez Law Office Po Bx 1888

Clovis, CA 93613-1888

Ramirez, Edward R., JR

Defendant Attorney

Batchman, Bret N.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Garza, John; Farners Insurance Company, Inc.; Fire Insurance Exchange; Comment: With Prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Fire Insurance Exchange Answer to FAC.pdf

Amended Document Filed

Summons; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Summons to 1st Amended Complaint.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Farners Insurance Company, Inc.; Comment: Without Prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 8/28/17 at 1pm RM #305

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice

Case Management Statement Filed

Garza v FIE - FIE Case Management Statement.pdf

Statement filed

Statement

Amended Document Filed

Summons; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Summons to 1st Amended Complaint.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Garza, John; Farners Insurance Company, Inc.; Fire Insurance Exchange; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Farners Insurance Company, Inc.; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 2-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 8/28/17 at 1pm RM #305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2014
  • Civil complaint filed- Comment: Civil complaint filed gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial info for Fire Insurance Exchange: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-10611 Fire Insurance Exchange $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial info for Fire Insurance Exchange: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial info for Fire Insurance Exchange: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54451 Fire Insurance Exchange $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial info for Fire Insurance Exchange: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial: Fire Insurance Exchange; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Financial info for Garza, John: Counter Payment Receipt # 197780 Garza, John $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Financial info for Garza, John: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Financial: Garza, John; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-004 SHOMY TITLE CASE NABER

Lira v. Fec Insimance Pxchange

12CEGO368S

4. {(Conbnuad) bmetruenamesofae‘cndamsmdasDoeemmhmmmm {1} [Z] Doe defendants (sperify Dos aumbersy: 1710 defeaaanlsammdminmemwoflhalwammm 2} {_J Doe vefendants (spocily Doe mumbers): 110 plawdiT, ¢. [] information about ackiitional gelendand= who are not naturs! persons & contained in Attachment 4c. q [ Defendants who are joined under Coge of Caivil Procedura saction 382 are {names):

were the agents or enployees of the named

are persons whose Capaciies are unknown o

5. [ Prasnbef is requiredt lo compty with a daims stalule, snd a. (] has complied with applicable claims stakudas, or b. [] & excxrsad from complying becausa (specify}:

8. [ ] Ths actionis subjectte [ civil Code secton 1812 10 () vl Code section 2084.4. 7. Thes coaut is the proper court becagse a [+/] adefendant entered into the contract here. b. [] adefendant Ived hers when the cortract was entered into. C,Dadefendambvesherenm. ' d. [/} the conivad] was 1o be performed hese. e [ ade(andamisawwafimumimmfaedamaaditspdmlplaoeofmsimsishm. . [#] rest progey that is the subject of this action is locsled hare. g [) other {spocify).

£. The following causes of action are attached and the Hatements above apply to each (each complamt must have ong o mova causes of schion atfacheg):

(] Breach of Contract

] Commion Counts [ Other {specay):

9. {7 Other alegabions:

10 PRt prays for pdgment for costs of suit for sasch retief 2< & Rair, just, and equdable; and for a. [T damages of § $30,000.00 b. [#] inerest on the damages (1) [Z] according fo proos {2) {1 at the rate of (specify): percenl per year kom {date): c. {¥) @womey's fees M Jot s {2} [ according o proof

d, [__] other (specaty):

11. [] Tre paragraphs of this preading afleged on imformaton and belief are s ollows {specify paragraph e ors):

Dah.’ OC‘ObeI 2?’ 2016

Edward R. Ramirez » (ITRR OF PRINT NAME} ot

(7 you wash 1o verily this plesding, afix & varitedion. )