This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/24/2019 at 15:14:57 (UTC).

Jimmy Vasquez vs Vanessa Vasquez

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Jimmy Vasquez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Vanessa Vasquez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gamoian, Lisa, Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3350

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gamoian, Lisa

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vasquez, Jimmy

Respondent

Vasquez, Vanessa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Rusca, Rodney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Final Judgment Dissolution/MSA; Party Names: Vasquez, Jimmy; Vasquez, Vanessa; Comment: (Marital status ends: 2/24/2019. Wife's former name restored to: Vanessa Ramirez.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Withdraw of Attorney- Comment: Attorney Withdrawing: Rodney Rusca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep- Comment: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment sent via mail to each party in SASE provided. Judgment e-filed to Attorney Rodney Rusca's office.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: FLEX for Judgment Review (w/ envelopes). File Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Proposed Documents- Comment: Judgment - Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Proposed Documents- Comment: Declaration for Default or Uncontested - Accepted Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Pro Per Box filed under "V" - petitioner's conformed order on court fee waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: FLEX for fee waiver review with copy and with file attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Financial info for Vasquez, Vanessa: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Financial info for Vasquez, Vanessa: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Financial: Vasquez, Vanessa; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Financial info for Vasquez, Jimmy: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial info for Vasquez, Jimmy: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial: Vasquez, Jimmy; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.