This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:57:31 (UTC).

Jim Doyle vs. Erik Schuk

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 Jim Doyle filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Erik Schuk. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0451

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

by and through his Successor in interest, Christina Fishinghawk

Doyle, Jim

Defendants

Orchard Park Leasing

Schuk, Erik V.

Orchard Park Management LLC

Doe 55

Doe 54

California Leasing, LLC

Orchard Park Owner LLC

Fortress Investment Group

Doe 53

Doe 52

FHC Property Management LLC

B California Leasing, LLC

Doe 51

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Stephen M.

Defendant Attorney

Christopoulos, Lynnette A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Dismissal.pdf

Proof of Service

POS.Fortress Investment Group.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Opposition filed

Opp.Brief.Stay.pdf; Comment: to defendants' supplemental brief RE stay

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Order signed and issued. FF to clerks office 06/15/2017, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept 402 on 6-6-17 Order for: Automatic Stay

Notice Filed

Notice of Ruling; Comment: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Ex Parte re: Arbitrtion related Discovery

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Opposition

Proof of Service

POS.Orchard Park Management.pdf; Comment: Orchard Park Management LLC

Declaration Filed

Dec.SII.pdf

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Doyle, Jim; Schuk, Erik V.; Orchard Park Management LLC; Orchard Park Leasing; Orchard Park Owner LLC; California Leasing, LLC; FHC Property Management LLC; Fortress Investment Group; B California Leasing, LLC; Comment: with prejudice

Notice Filed

Ntc.Change.Firm.Name.pdf; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Service

POS.Doe51.Orchard Park Owners.pdf; Comment: Orchard Park Owners, LLC

Order Received for Signature

Prop.Order.Ex.Parte.Arb.Discovery.docx.pdf; Comment: Proposed Order

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling the Arbitration

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Proposed Order

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge Jeffery Y. Hamilton

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Peremptory Challenge.pdf; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Civil case cover sheet

CIvil Case Covesheet.pdf

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Doyle, Jim; Schuk, Erik V.; Orchard Park Management LLC; Orchard Park Leasing; Orchard Park Owner LLC; California Leasing, LLC; FHC Property Management LLC; Fortress Investment Group; B California Leasing, LLC; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: California Leasing, LLC; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Remittitur from the 5th DCA Filed - Civil- Comment: DCA F075709

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Order of Dismissal of Appeal after Certification - Civil- Comment: 5th DCA #F075709

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Dismissal.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Refund disbursed and sent to department for approval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Request to Return Trust for Civil Appeals- Comment: Close Trust-RTX- Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Ntc.Settlement.pdf; Comment: No action taken - case stayed pending appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Ntc.Change.Firm.Name.pdf; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for Schuk, Erik V.: Counter Payment Receipt # APP-2017-00076 Sacramento Legal Support, Inc. $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for Schuk, Erik V.: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Financial info for Schuk, Erik V.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01010 Orchard Park Management LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial info for Schuk, Erik V.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial: Schuk, Erik V.; Total Financial Assessment $485.00; Total Payments and Credits $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Financial info for Doyle, Jim: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-17483 Doyle, Jim $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Financial info for Doyle, Jim: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Financial info for Doyle, Jim: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-07923 Doyle, Jim $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Financial info for Doyle, Jim: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Financial: Doyle, Jim; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less