This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:07 (UTC).

JGB Properties, Inc vs Ali Saleh

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 JGB Properties, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ali Saleh. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2370

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JGB Properties

1418 E Shaw Ave

Fresno, CA 93710

JGB Properties, Inc.

1418 E Shaw Ave

Fresno, CA 93710

Defendant

Saleh, Ali

Fresno, CA 93706

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 02/20/14 to both parties. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 20-FEB-2014 by ZEYANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Judgment for- Comment: Court orders judgment entered on 2/13/14. Defendant Ali Saleh shall pay plaintiff JGB Properties, Inc., $7,240.00 principal and $114.00 costs, total judgment $7,354.00 on plaintiff's claim. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Auth to Appear on Behalf Party- Comment: Authorization to Appear on behalf of JGB Properties Inc., filed by Jagrup Bhandal on 2/13/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Minute order Judge Cabrera- Comment: Minute order from Dept 404 Clerk: J. Yang Reporter/Tape: 9/14/32 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Plaintiff: Jagrup Bhandal, President Defendant: Not Present Defendant Ali Saleh shall pay Plaintiff JGB Properties, Inc., $7,240.00 principal, $114.00 costs on Plaintiff's claim. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 13-FEB-2014 by ZEYANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court Sub served as to Ali Saleh and filed. Cost $ 39.00 mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$75.00 was made on receipt SCCE67209.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltfs claim and order filed- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 02/13/14 at 9:00 in Dept # 404 mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less