This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 03:03:41 (UTC).

Jery Saylor v Michelle M Flores etal udd

Case Summary

On 12/08/2010 Jery Saylor filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michelle M Flores etal udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1753

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saylor, Jerry

Defendants

Flores, Michelle M

Flores, Trinidad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saylor, Jerry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketWrit filed wholly satisfied; Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. psn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketOff calendar; Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 01/12/11. judgment entered. vs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Conversion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed; Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Michelle M and Trinidad Flores. cm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL33104.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketWrit issued for restitution; Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. cm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketRestitution of premises jgm; Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff Jerry Saylor against defendant Michelle M and Trinidad Flores on 12/29/10 for restitution of the premises only. cm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DocketSummons & comp - substituted; Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Michelle M Flores, co-occu by substituted service, mailed on 12/11/10 . cm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DocketSummons & comp - personal; Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Michelle M Flores by personal service on 12/11/10 . cm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketRestricted Access Notice sent; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 08-DEC-2010 by CMOLINA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL32889.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketNotice of UD Dismissal Hrg; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 08-DEC-2010 by CMOLINA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less