This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 17:06:07 (UTC).

Jeremy Morrisseau vs. Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 Jeremy Morrisseau filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Gamoian, Lisa and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1912

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Gamoian, Lisa

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morrisseau, Jeremy

Defendants

Stanislas-Johnson, Johanna

Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gordon, Dean B.

Defendant Attorney

Graham, Becki D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Stipulated protective order

Order Received for Signature

[Proposed] Stip & Protective Order(signed).pdf; Comment: (Order signed) Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: Protective Order

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: To be Determined

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: To 1st Amended Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

2017_02_02_P's Ntc of Posting Jury Fees.pdf; Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Proof of Service

2017_01_23_POS S&C, etc. J Johnson.pdf; Comment: Johanna; first amended complaint

Amended Document Filed

First Amended Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint filed.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Case Management Conference set for October 17, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. dept 104---Case assigned to Judge Kristi Culver Kapetan for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by Plaintiff with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Jury Requested by Party- Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Stipulated protective order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- [Proposed] Stip & Protective Order(signed).pdf; Comment: (Order signed) Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2017
  • Financial info for Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01246 Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Financial info for Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Financial: Wal-Mart Stores Inc, a Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial info for Morrisseau, Jeremy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-16239 Morrisseau, Jeremy $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial info for Morrisseau, Jeremy: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Morrisseau, Jeremy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-06599 Morrisseau, Jeremy $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Financial info for Morrisseau, Jeremy: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Financial info for Morrisseau, Jeremy: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00021518 Dean Gordon $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Financial info for Morrisseau, Jeremy: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Financial: Morrisseau, Jeremy; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less