This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/10/2018 at 21:33:51 (UTC).

Jeremy Mason vs. Community Medical Centers

Case Summary

On 10/04/2016 Jeremy Mason filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Community Medical Centers. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Dalesandro, Samuel and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7901

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mason, Jeremy

Defendant

Community Medical Centers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shahrokh, Koorosh K

Defendant Attorney

Hunt, Gary A.

 

Court Documents

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Proposed Order

Declaration Filed

Declaration in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date; Comment: Declaration in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date

Declaration Filed

1931125_8811-2018030; Comment: Declaration of Koorosh K. Shahrokh

Order Received for Signature

1902900_5291-2018021; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: D401 Order for: to Continue Trial

Stipulation Filed

1902900_3611-2018021; Comment: to Continue Trial

Statement filed

Statement of Undisputed; Comment: Statement of Undisputed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Civil Complaint filed

20161004100933190.pdf

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Date; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice

Statement filed

1931125_7701-2018030; Comment: Plaintiff's Swparate Sttemetn of Material Facts

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: Statement

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: Statement

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: of Evidence

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

20161115083015810.pdf; Comment: Community Medical Centers

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by Defendant with estimated time of 7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Motion - Continue Trial- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date; Comment: Declaration in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion- Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Date; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Community Medical Centers: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-03305 Community Medical Centers $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Community Medical Centers: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Financial info for Community Medical Centers: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-55804 Community Medical Centers $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Financial info for Community Medical Centers: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Financial: Community Medical Centers; Total Financial Assessment $1,110.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,110.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Financial info for Mason, Jeremy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-12310 Mason, Jeremy $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Financial info for Mason, Jeremy: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Financial info for Mason, Jeremy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-44696 Mason, Jeremy $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Financial info for Mason, Jeremy: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Financial: Mason, Jeremy; Total Financial Assessment $430.00; Total Payments and Credits $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FAX: 818-996-7302

TEL.. 818-996-7301

NATIONAL CHOICE LAWYERS

6345 BALBOA BLVD., BLDG. [Il, SUITE 273, ENCINO, CA 81316

NATIONAL CHOICE LAWYERS

6345 Balboa Blvd., Building III, Suite 273 10/4/2016

Los Angeles, California 91316 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Telephone: (818)-996-7301 |

Facsimile: (818)-996-7302 By: M. Baisdon, Deputy

E-Mail: Mr.K@NationalChoiceLawyers.com Attorney for Plaintiff, JEREMY MASON

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO - B.F. SISK COURTHOUSE

JEREMY MASON, an individual, Case No.: 16CECL07901 Plaintiff, Judge: VS. Department:

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR

COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTERS,a | NEGLIGENCE business entity, form unknown, and DOES o 1 to 100, inclusive, Limited over $15,000.00

Defendants.

COMES NOW Plaintiff, JEREMY MASON, an individual, (hereinafter “Plaintiff’} and alleges, avers, and claims against Defendants COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTERS, a business entity, form unknown, and DOES 1 to 100, inclusive (hereinafter “Defendants™) and each of them, as follows: L

PARTIES & JURISDICTION

1. Plaintiff is an individual over the age of eighteen (18) and is now and/or at all times

mentioned in this Complaint a resident of the State of California.

mentioned in this Complaint a resident of the State of California. FAX: 8189967302

FAX: 8189967302

NATIONAL CHOICE LAWYERS

6345 BALBOA BLVD., BLDG. lll, SUITE 273, ENCINO, CA 91316

TEL.: 818-926-7301

21 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION 2 GENERAL NEGLIGENCE

28. Plaintiff incorporates by reference and alleges each and every one of the allegations

contained in the preceding and foregoing paragraphs of this Complaint as if fully set forth

herein.

29. Defendant Community Medical Centers had a duty to Plaintiff no ensure that 1ts facility was

safe for Plaintiff.