This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/24/2019 at 15:14:39 (UTC).

Jennifer Garcia vs Richard Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 Jennifer Garcia filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Richard Garcia. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kalemkarian, David, Hopper, Cindy and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3294

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kalemkarian, David

Hopper, Cindy

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garcia, Jennifer Lea

Respondent

Garcia, Richard W

Minor

Garcia, Phoenix O

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: Not Reported Petitioner not present Respondent not present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 5/19/20 Time: 10:30 a.m. Dept.: 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: FL Supervisor: Request For Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Child Custody and Visitation Order Signed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Dept: 203 Time: 8:48 a.m. Judge D. Kalemkarian Clerk: L. Garvin Reporter: P. Whaley Petitioner: Present/ ProPer Respondent: Present/ ProPer Hearing Type: Return Readiness- TIER III Other: The parties participated in mediation and were able to reach a full agreement. The Court adopts the agreement as the order of the Court. The parties are given conformed copies of the order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Return Readiness- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: TIER III; Parties Present- Petitioner: Garcia, Jennifer Lea; Parties Present- Respondent: Garcia, Richard W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • FCS Documents Submitted- Comment: CCRC Report & Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • FCS Tier 3/At-Court CCRC- Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: FCS Report and Recommendation Submitted; Comment: Mo - 1156 FA - 1052; Parties Present- Petitioner: Garcia, Jennifer Lea; Parties Present- Respondent: Garcia, Richard W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • FCS Tier 3/At-Court CCRC- Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: Fa - 1054

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Property Declaration- Comment: Separate property declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children- Comment: Summons issued yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Financial info for Garcia, Jennifer Lea: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00011707 Garcia, Jennifer Lea $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Financial info for Garcia, Jennifer Lea: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial info for Garcia, Jennifer Lea: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00007968 Garcia, Jennifer Lea $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial info for Garcia, Jennifer Lea: Transaction Assessment $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial: Garcia, Jennifer Lea; Total Financial Assessment $615.00; Total Payments and Credits $615.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.