This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:36:02 (UTC).

JD Home Rentals vs. Norma Castro

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 JD Home Rentals filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Norma Castro. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9327

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JD Home Rentals

Defendant

Castro, Norma Hernandez

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armo, Lance E.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; JD Home Rentals; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Castro, Norma Hernandez; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,138.00; Holdover Damages: $533.30; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $445.00; Total: $2,616.30

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: JD Home Rentals; Castro, Norma Hernandez; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; JD Home Rentals; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2414 E. Lewis #A Fresno CA 93701; Awarded Against:; Castro, Norma Hernandez

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: Entered as to:

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 10

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Norma Hernandez Castro

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; JD Home Rentals; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Castro, Norma Hernandez; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,138.00; Holdover Damages: $533.30; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $445.00; Total: $2,616.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: JD Home Rentals; Castro, Norma Hernandez; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; JD Home Rentals; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 2414 E. Lewis #A Fresno CA 93701; Awarded Against:; Castro, Norma Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Financial info for JD Home Rentals: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00040662 Armo, Lance E. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Financial info for JD Home Rentals: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for JD Home Rentals: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038576 Armo, Lance E. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for JD Home Rentals: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial: JD Home Rentals; Total Financial Assessment $265.00; Total Payments and Credits $265.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.