This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 20:08:11 (UTC).

Janette Wong vs.Fresno Produce Co., A California Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 Janette Wong filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Fresno Produce Co , A California Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2176

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wong, Janette

Defendant

Fresno Produce Co., A California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, Catherine Anne

Defendant Attorney

Giovacchini, Thomas M.

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Wong Mediation Stip .pdf; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: (LEFT BLANK)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

General Denial Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: General Denial.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by Defendant with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Wong Mediation Stip .pdf; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: (LEFT BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Jury Requested by Party- Comment: estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Produce Co., A California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-51113 Fresno Produce Co., A California Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Produce Co., A California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial: Fresno Produce Co., A California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for Wong, Janette: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-28355 Wong, Janette $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for Wong, Janette: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial: Wong, Janette; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less