This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:25:39 (UTC).

Janet Heisinger vs Carmen Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 Janet Heisinger filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Carmen Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Snauffer, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3761

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Heisinger, Janet

Harris, Leanne

Harris, Timothy R.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

Harris, Timothy R

Harris, Leanne

Gonzalez, Carmen

Doe 1

Harris, Matthew

Roe 1

Harris, Matthew R

Harris, Timothy R.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Gonzalez, Carmen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Netzer, Jonathan Gary

Schoenburg, Patrick S.

Demarest, John A.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Demarest, John A.

 

Court Documents

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition; Comment: Forwarded to dept. 402

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: to Cross-Complaint

Amendment filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: to Complaint naming Doe 1: Matthew Harris

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: To Cross-Complaint of Carmen Gonzales

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fees paid for Defendants Timothy Harris and Leanne Harris

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons-Cross-Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: on Third Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to First Cross-Complaint

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference filed 05/18/2017

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Cross-Complaint of Timothy R. & Leanne Harris

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: Cross-Complaint of Timothy R. & Leanne Harris

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Judge Patrick O'Hara

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons-Cross-Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by Defendant with estimated time of 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed- Opposition; Comment: Forwarded to dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request for Pretrial Discovery; Comment: Request for Pretrial Discovery (Forwarded to department 402)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: on Third Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross Complaint Filed- Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: Third Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to First Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to Timothy and Leanne Harris' Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for Harris, Timothy R: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial: Harris, Timothy R; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Financial info for Gonzalez, Carmen: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-10887 Gonzalez, Carmen $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Financial info for Gonzalez, Carmen: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Financial info for Gonzalez, Carmen: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-06355 Gonzalez, Carmen $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Financial info for Gonzalez, Carmen: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Financial: Gonzalez, Carmen; Total Financial Assessment $735.00; Total Payments and Credits $735.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for Heisinger, Janet: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-53351 Heisinger, Janet $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for Heisinger, Janet: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial: Heisinger, Janet; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less