This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 17:28:46 (UTC).

James Smith vs. Kimmies Tavern & Grill, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2015 James Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kimmies Tavern Grill, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Diaz, Monica, Cullers, Mark, Dalesandro, Samuel, Gamoian, Lisa and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1465

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Diaz, Monica

Cullers, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

Gamoian, Lisa

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Smith, James

Smith, Sherese

Defendants

Kimmies Tavern & Grill, Inc.

Calaya, Mark

Pelley, Jayson

Padilla, Frank

Hudson, Kimberly

Pelley, Jason

Celaya, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wagner, Nicholas

Defendant Attorneys

Knudtson, Gigi M.

Hunt, Gary A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference; Comment: forwarded to dept. 402

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Amanda Kendzora Re Service of Larry Jayson Pelley

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document; Comment: on First Amended Complaint

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Pretrial Discovery Conference

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference filed 06/27/2017

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro; Comment: Plaintiff

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order After Pretrial Discovery Conference

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 401 Order for:Posting or Publication of Order to Show Cause

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Motion - Good Faith Settlement- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: Layton Koberlein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Motion - Quash- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: Laura Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Motion - Good Faith Settlement- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Alex Newsome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Pretrial Discovery Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2016
  • Financial info for Celaya, Mark: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00012756 Hunt, Gary A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Financial info for Celaya, Mark: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Financial: Celaya, Mark; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, James: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-41219 Smith, James $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, James: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, James: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00005791 Wagner, Nicholas $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Financial info for Smith, James: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Financial info for Smith, James: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00004438 Wagner, Nicholas $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Financial info for Smith, James: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Financial: Smith, James; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less