Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:44 (UTC).

James M Patton Jr vs Granville Realty

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 James M Patton Jr filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Granville Realty. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2369

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patton Jr, James Matthew

Pacific Grove, CA 93940

Patton, James Matthew, JR

Defendant

Granville Realty-Mr. Darius Assemi

Fresno, CA 93711

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 3/11/14 to both parties. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 11-MAR-2014 by ZEYANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Auth to Appear on Behalf Party- Comment: Authorization to Appear on behalf of Granville Realty filed by Tiffanie Marshall on 03/07/14. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Judgment for- Comment: Matter is taken under advisement and ruled on the same day. Court orders judgment entered on 03/07/14. Defendant Granville Realty does not owe anything on Plaintiff's claim. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Minute order Judge Cabrera- Comment: Minute order from Dept 404 Clerk: J. Yang Reporter/Tape: 8/37/29 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Plaintiff: James Matthew Patton, Jr. Defendant: Tiffanie Marshall, Property Asset Manager Matter is taken under advisement and ruled on the same day. Defendant Granville Realty does not owe anything on Plaintiff's claim. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-MAR-2014 by ZEYANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Party not stip to temp judge- Comment: Defendant Granville Realty does not stipulate to Temporary Judge. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 11-FEB-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Certificate of mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Notice of Calendar Setting was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 2/11/14 . Parties served: All Parties lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 11-FEB-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Granville Realty-Mr Darius Assemi and filed. Cost $ 35.00 mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$30.00 was made on receipt SCCE67206.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 02/11/14 at 1:30 in Dept # 97E mt Event: Pltf's claim & order filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less