This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/09/2022 at 03:32:54 (UTC).

James M Lanier vs San Joaquin Valley Officials

Case Summary

On 09/11/2013 James M Lanier filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against San Joaquin Valley Officials. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark W, Dalesandro, Samuel and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2843

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark W

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanier, James M

Defendants

Broad, Fred

Wright, Randy

Kirby, Frank

Long, William

Kayajanian, Bob

Beatie, Brig

Mateo, Ed

Costa, Greg

Henkleman, Dieter

San Joaquin Valley Officials Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lanier, James M

Defendant Attorneys

Makasian, James

Makasian, James M.

 

Court Documents

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does:1-10

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Request for Production of Documents Propounded by Plaintiff James M. Lanier's to Defendant San Joaquin Valley Officials Assn.

General Denial Filed

General Denial Filed

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default; Comment: ********SET ASIDE PER ORDER SIGNED ON 12/22/2015******** on the 2nd Amended Complaint and Court Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: No. #6 (b) is Incomplete does nto show Service to Defendant's Atty. Sheldon Feigel

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: or Order

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal

06/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

Dismissal Not Entered

06/28/2018: Dismissal Not Entered

Request for Dismissal

06/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Filed

05/14/2018: Declaration Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

05/14/2018: Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Notice of Motion

05/14/2018: Notice of Motion

Civil Document

05/02/2018: Civil Document

Declaration Filed

04/24/2018: Declaration Filed

Opposition filed

04/24/2018: Opposition filed

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by Defendant with an estimated time of 7-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketGeneral Motion; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: to set aside sanction/order; James Lanier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Lanier, James M; San Joaquin Valley Officials Association; Broad, Fred; Wright, Randy; Kirby, Frank; Long, William; Kayajanian, Bob; Beatie, Brig; Mateo, Ed; Costa, Greg; Henkleman, Dieter; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Page 2 is required when court fees are waived. Please resubmit with page 2 attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lanier, James M: Fee Waiver $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lanier, James M: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
246 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2013
  • DocketProof of service-summon def.; Comment: Proof of service of summons on Dieter Henkleman filed showing defective service no date or time given. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • DocketProof of service-summon def.; Comment: Proof of service of summons on Bob Kayajanian filed showing defective service no date or time given. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 11-SEP-2013 by DHOUSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketCourt Fees Waived; Comment: $ 435.00 (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify: filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketOrder granting waiver of fees; Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by dhouston filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. dhouston Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketCivil complaint filed; Comment: Civil complaint filed dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

JAMES M. LANIER

P.O. Box 25211 Fresno, California 93729 D Telephone: (559) 260-7222

Email: laniervisioneyahoo.com APR {1 2015

IN PRO PER ‘ . 5 FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT y ! .

DEPUTY IN THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO

CASE NO. 13 CECG 02843 JAMES M. LANIER, ~ PLAINTIFF JAMES M. LANIER’S

Plaintiff, OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS

DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND

vs. AMENDED COMPLAINT SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY OFFICIALS | Judge: Hon. Mark W. Snauffer ASSOCIATION; FRED BROAD; RANDY Dept: 502 WRIGHT; FRANK KIRBY; WILLIAM LONG; Date: April 27, 2016

; G BE ; ED . . Q-

BOB KAYAJANIAN; BRIG BEATIE Time: 3:30pm CEoa02843

MATEO; GREG COSTA; DIETER HENKLEMAN

opP and DOES 1 TO 10, Opposiiion flied

( TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

Defendants.

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on April 27, 2016 at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 502 of the above entitled court, located at 1130 “O” Street Fresno, California, Plaintiff, James M. Lanier will move to oppose Defendant San Joaquin Valley Officials Association’s (hereinafter “SJIVOA”) Demurrer to Plaintiff” Second Amended Complaint. |

This action is in opposition to Defendant San Joaquin Valley Officials Association

(SJVOA) Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment.

| CASE HISTORY

(1) Plaintiff was granted pefrhission, pursuant to CRC 391(a) and CCP section 1019.5(aj, to file his Second Amended Complaint (SAC) on February 4, 2015 by Judge Mark W. Snauffer.

(2) Plaintiff filed his SAC on February 18, 2015 and processed service on Defendants by mail to Fred Broad, President of STVOA Board of Directors and Agent for Service for STVOA Board of Directors and Sheldon Feigel, former attorney

(3) Defendants failed to respond to Plaintiff’s SAC within the designated time limit for responding to a complaint.

(4) Oral arguments were heard in this Court on February 24, 2016 regarding Defendants Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment. |

(5) Plaintiff presented Judge Snauffer, during those oral arguments, with informative evidence of Defendants deliberate failure to respond to all Court hearings, CMC’s and responsive documentation from January 14, 2014 to October 2015 when Defendants obtained new counsel.

(6) Defendants filed demurrer to Plaintiff’s SAC on March 24, 2016.

FACTS CONCERNING Ti—IE NATURE OF THIS DISPUTE

Plaintiff has uncovered new additional evidence of Defendants deliberate efforts to igfiore all court hearings and documentation. |

Plaintiff has been waiting for a ruling from Judge Snauffer, which Judge Snauffer took under advisement, since the oral arguments were presented on February 24, 2016 regarding this cases’ default status. Defendants attorney has prematurely filed this demurrer to Plaintiff’s SAC and for the reasons sét forth, Plaintiff respectfully requests that the Defendants’ Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Second | Amended Complaint be denied. f |

CONCLUSION

Plaintiff, in the interim, respectfully request this Courts permission to withhold his full opposition to Defendants Demurrer documentation until Judge Snauffer rules on the oral arguments from February 24, 2016 and rules on Plaintiff’s Motion to Reinstate Default and Reconsider Default Judgment on April 27, 2016. |

LANTER v. SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY OFFICIALS ASSOCIATION, et al. Case No. 13-CECG-02843 PLAINTIFF JAMES M. LANIER’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND

LANTER v. SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY OFFICIALS ASSOCIATION, et al. Case No. 13-CECG-02843 PLAINTIFF JAMES M. LANIER’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND DATED: April 11, 2016

DATED: April 11, 2016

LANTER v. SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY OFFTICIALS ASSOCIATION, et al. Case No. 13-CECG-02843 PLAINTIFF JAMES M. LANIER’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND

LANTER v. SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY OFFTICIALS ASSOCIATION, et al. Case No. 13-CECG-02843 PLAINTIFF JAMES M. LANIER’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND Fresno Count | CASE 13 CECG 02843 Superior cougt Lanier v. San Joaquin Valley Officials Assn, et al.

Fresno Count | CASE 13 CECG 02843 Superior cougt Lanier v. San Joaquin Valley Officials Assn, et al.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

I, the undersigned say: I am over the age of eighteen years, not a party to the above-entitled matter, residing in

Fresno County, and my address is - | Fresno, California 93721.

On the date set forth below I deposited in the United States mail in Fresno, California, copies of the documents described below, enclosed in sealed envelopes with postage

thereon fully prepaid, addressed as follows:

James Makasian o (559) 442-4212 (tele) 1327 “N” Street (559) 445-0328 (fax) Fresno, California 93721

Attorney for Defendant San Joaquin Valley Officials Assn., et alt

Documents Served:

PLAINTIFF JAMES M. LANIER’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO

PLAINTIFF’S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

‘I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the foregoing is true and correct, and that this declaration was executed in Fresno, CA on the

date below.

Dated: April 9, 2016

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAKASIAN, JAMES M.