This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:00 (UTC).

James K Fusselman v Javon Waldrop/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 James K Fusselman filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Javon Waldrop/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1511

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fusselman, James K

Defendant

Waldrop, Javon

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fusselman, James K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE328157.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. A payment of $25.00 was made on receipt number CLCE CLCE328157 . The money was deposited into Trust on original receipt number CLCE327651, writ issued today. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI Hearing scheduled for 02/24/14. Clerk's Judgment enter on 02/04/14. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff James K Fusselman against defendant Javon Waldrop on 02/04/14 for restitution of the premises only 3460 N. Brawley # 101, Fresno, CA 93722. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Default previously enter on 01/17/14. Writ not issue-page #2 on writ is incomplete. ***Copies placed in tickler under "F"*** lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Mail Payment Moved to Trust- Comment: Payment type: Credit card James Fusselman Amount: $ 25.00 Receipt no: Payment for: Writ to Issue ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment no tag or S. A.S. E ed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323956.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MKNISPEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Financial info for Fusselman, James K: Counter Payment Receipt # 328157 Fusselman, James K $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Financial info for Fusselman, James K: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Financial: Fusselman, James K; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less