This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 18:55:22 (UTC).

CASE STRICKEN PER TENTATIVE RULING/Jaime Lazo vs Matt Navo

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 CASE STRICKEN PER TENTATIVE RULING/Jaime Lazo filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Matt Navo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1136

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loza, Jaime

Defendant

Navo, Matt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Czeshinski, Michael J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

Judgment

Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Navo, Matt; Awarded Against:; Loza, Jaime; Comment: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS ONLY

Memorandum of Costs filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Total Costs: $454.16

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forwarded to Dept. Clerks Office [Proposed] Judgment for Processing

Memorandum of Costs

08/20/2018: Memorandum of Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment

08/20/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment

07/30/2018: Judgment

Civil Document

06/19/2018: Civil Document

Notice of Related Case

05/10/2018: Notice of Related Case

Request

05/10/2018: Request

Declaration

05/10/2018: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

05/10/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice

05/10/2018: Notice

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs filed; Comment: Total Costs: $454.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Navo, Matt; Awarded Against; Loza, Jaime; Comment: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Forwarded to Dept. Clerks Office [Proposed] Judgment for Processing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Striking/Voiding of Complaint/Petition; Party; Names: Loza, Jaime; Navo, Matt; Comment: Per Tentative Ruling 6/19/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketMotion - SLAPP Motion; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: Michael Czenshinski Anti-Slapp Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Navo, Matt: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-33562 Navo, Matt $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion and Notice of Special Motion of Defendant Matthew Navo to Strike Complaint (Anti-SLAPP Motion C.C.P. 425.16)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Special Motion and Notice of Special Motion of Defendant Matthew Navo to Strike Complaint (Anti-SLAPP Motion C.C.P. 425.16)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Loza, Jaime: Fee Waiver $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Loza, Jaime: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Loza, Jaime; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Michael J. Czeshinski, #138063 Quentin C. Cedar, #251153

(SPACE BELOW FOR FILING STAMP ONLY)

WILKINS, DROLSHAGEN & CZESHINSKI LLP

6785 N. Willow Ave. Fresno, CA 93710 Telephone: (559) 438-2390 Facsimile: (559) 438-2393

Attorneys for Defendant, Matt Navo

E-FILED

5/10/2018 4:14 PM

FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

By: K. Daves, Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF FRESNO, CENTRAL DIVISION

JAIME LOZA, Plaintiff, V.

MATT NAVO,

Defendants.

TO PLAINTIFF JAMIE LOZA:

Case Number 18CECG01136

Date: June 19, 2018

Time: 3:30 p.m.

Dept.: 501

Judge: Honorable Mark W. Snauffer

SPECIAL MOTION AND NOTICE OF SPECIAL MOTION OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW NAVO TO STRIKE

COMPLAINT (Anti-SLAPP Motion C.C.P. § 425.16)

Complaint filed: April 3, 2018

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on June 19, 2018, at 3:30 p.m., or as soon thereafter as the

matter can be heard, in Department 501, of the above entitled Court at the B.F. Sisk Courthouse ,

1130 “O” Street, in the City of Fresno, County of Fresno, State of California, Defendant,

MATTHEW NAVO (erroneously sued as “MATT NAVO”) will move said Court for its Order

granting a special motion to strike the complaint pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure

section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP Motion).

This special motion will be made on the grounds that:

. The complaint arises from Plaintiff MATTHEW NAVQO’s (hereinafter referred to as

“Superintendent Navo™) having submitted a declaration in prior judicial proceedings in which

Notice of Special Motion of Defendant Matthew Navo to Strike Complaint (Anti-SLAPP Motion C.C.P. § 425.16)

Notice of Special Motion of Defendant Matthew Navo to Strike Complaint (Anti-SLAPP Motion C.C.P. § 425.16) Superintendent Navo’s employer, Sanger Unified School District, sought workplace violence and temporary restraining orders against Plaintiff JAMIE LOZA (hereinafter “Mr. Loza”), whichfurtherance of Superintendent Navo’s right of petition or free speech under the United States Constitution and the California Constitution in connection with a public issue within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16, subdivisions (b)(1) and (e)(1) and (e)(2), and

Superintendent Navo’s employer, Sanger Unified School District, sought workplace violence and temporary restraining orders against Plaintiff JAMIE LOZA (hereinafter “Mr. Loza”), whichfurtherance of Superintendent Navo’s right of petition or free speech under the United States Constitution and the California Constitution in connection with a public issue within the meaning of California Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16, subdivisions (b)(1) and (e)(1) and (e)(2), and

2 Mr. Loza cannot establish there is a probability said Plaintiff will prevail on the claim in that it is not legally sufficient and as a matter of law the prior judicial proceedings in that as a matter Civil Code section 47, subdivision (b), provides an absolute privilege for, among many others and with some exceptions, publications made in any judicial proceeding. (Flatley v. Mauro (2006) 39 Cal.4th 299, 322.)

This motion will be based upon this Notice, the accompanying points and authorities submitted in support of this motion, and to be submitted; the accompanying Request for Judicial Notice submitted in support of this motion, and to be submitted; evidence, oral and documentary, introduced at the hearing of this motion, and upon all of the pleadings, records, documents and materials on file or lodged in this action.

Dated: May 10, 2018 WILKINS, DROLSHAGEN & CZESHINSKI LLP

By Michael J. Czeshinski Quentin Cedar

Attorneys for Defendant, Matt Navo

2 Notice of Special Motion of Defendant Matthew Navo to Strike Complaint (Anti-SLAPP Motion C.C.P. § 425.16)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CZESHINSKI, MICHAEL J