This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:30 (UTC).

Jacqueline Ward v Brandy Atrat

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Jacqueline Ward filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Brandy Atrat. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2374

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ward, Jacqueline

Clovis, CA 93611

Defendants

Atrat, Brandy

Clovis, CA 93611

Atrat, Kyle

Clovis, CA 93611

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Returned documents letter- Comment: Documents returned: Defendants Claim Reason: Defendant's Claims are only filed by the Defendant's if they chose to serve the Plaintiff. You are the Plaintiff in this case therefore we have filed your Plaintiff's claim only. Date: 5/20/14 cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Exhibits returned- Comment: Request for return of exhibits filed by Brandy Atrat. Exhibits returned Packet letter and Plaintiff's Claims. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Order: Request to return exhibits Forwarded to: dept #404 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 2/20/14 to all parties. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 20-FEB-2014 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Judgment for- Comment: Court orders judgment entered on 2/20/14. Defendant Brandy Atrat does not owe anything on Plaintiff Jacqueline Ward's claim. Plaintiff Jacqueline Ward does not owe anything on Defendant(s) Brandy Atrat and Kyle Atrat's claim. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Taken under advisement- Comment: Taken under advisement and ruled on the same day. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Small Claims case referred to Mediation. No agreement reached. lmi Event: Referral to Mediation SC

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2014
  • Deft's claim for personal svc- Comment: Claim of Defendant given to Jacqueline Ward for personal service. mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • Defendant's Claim filed- Comment: Claim of Defendant filed by Jacqueline Ward in the amount of $ 4280.00 mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Brandy Atrat and filed. Cost $ 15.00 mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$15.00 was made on receipt SCCE67431.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Pltf claim mailed cert mail- Comment: Plaintiff's claim mailed to Brandy Atrat on 12-27-13 by certified mail, return receipt requested. ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$30.00 was made on receipt SCCE67226.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . Unkonwn cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 2/20/14 at 8:45 am in Dept #97E. cc Event: Pltf's claim & order filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less