This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 05:24:10 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 01/23/2014 XXXXX was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0231

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robinson, Jack

Defendants

Phi, Brian

Lewright, David

Amaro, Samantha

Amaro- Sanchez, Samantha

, (DPS Officer), Sylvester

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robinson, Jackie

Defendant Attorneys

Newhouse, Trevor J

Phillips, James C.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Robinson, Jack; Phi, Brian; Lewright, David; Amaro- Sanchez, Samantha;, (DPS Officer), Sylvester; Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Without Prejudice

Judgment

Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Phi, Brian; Awarded Against:; Robinson, Jack

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Defendant Lewright and Amaro's Index of Exhibits in support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Declaration of James C. Phillips

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Summary Judgment

Response filed

Response filed; Comment: to defendants' separate statement of undisputed material facts

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion for Summary Judgment. Hearing set for 9-3-15 at 3:30 pm Dept. 403

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal with Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Answer to Second Amended Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: on amended complaint

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Summary Judgment

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Reply filed

Reply filed; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Dr. Phi's Motioin for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication

Opposition filed

Civil Document; Comment: to defendant Dr. Phi's motion for summary judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Robinson, Jack; Phi, Brian; Lewright, David; Amaro- Sanchez, Samantha;, (DPS Officer), Sylvester; Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Phi, Brian; Awarded Against:; Robinson, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: (DPS Officer), Sylvester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal with Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Trial Setting Conference- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Counter Payment Receipt # 198602 Phi, Brian $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Counter Payment Receipt # 191419 Phi, Brian $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Counter Payment Receipt # 190931 Phi, Brian $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Counter Payment Receipt # 190006 Phi, Brian $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Financial info for Phi, Brian: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Financial: Phi, Brian; Total Financial Assessment $1,295.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,295.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

KAMALA D. HARRIS Fee exempt per Govt Code 6103 Attorney General of California

ALBERTO L. GONZALEZ :

Supervising Deputy Attorney General

JAMES C. PHILLIPS | E-FILED

Deputy Attorney General

State Bar No. 121848 8/22/2016 1300 I Street, Suite 125 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT P.O. Box 944255 By: M. Sanchez, Deputy

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Telephone: (916) 322-5473

Fax: (916) 322-8288

E-mail: James.Phillips@doj.ca.gov Attorneys for Defendants Samantha Amaro, and David Lewright

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO CIVIL DIVISION

| Case No. 14 CECG 00231 via fax file

Plaintiff, | ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED

COMPLAINT

JACKIE ROBINSON,