This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/07/2022 at 00:08:59 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 01/17/2013 XXXXX was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark, Smith, Bruce and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0247

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Smith, Bruce

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc

Cross Defendant and Defendant

CVIN, LLC

Cross Plaintiffs

ITC Service Group, Inc., A Nevada Corporation

J. Fletcher Creamer & Son Inc

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Harris, Charles L

Jennings, Marc J

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

McGee, Steven D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: First amended cross-complaint

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Returned: Notice of Motion for Summary Adjudication; Declaration; Separate Statement; Exhibits. Reason: $500.00 filing fee is required.

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Bernard Kamine New Attorney: Charles L Harris Bar#146546

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Of Matthew R. Dildine In Support Of Cvin, Llc's Opposition To J. Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Adjudicatio

Reply filed

CROSS-DEFENDANT ITC SERVICE GROUP, INC.???S REPLY TO CVIN, L; Comment: OPPOSITION TO ITC???S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION AND FOR SANCTIONS

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Matthew R. Dildine in Support of CVIN's Motion for the Appointment of Discovery Refree for All Purposes

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Civil Document; Comment: forwarded to dept 502

Request for Dismissal

07/10/2017: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

01/17/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

01/05/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Civil Document

07/12/2016: Civil Document

Objection to Nelson Decl re: CVIN Opp to MSA

07/07/2016: Objection to Nelson Decl re: CVIN Opp to MSA

Suppl. JFC Decl. and Exhibits re: MSA Reply

07/07/2016: Suppl. JFC Decl. and Exhibits re: MSA Reply

Combined Separate Statement

07/07/2016: Combined Separate Statement

JFC Reply To CVIN Opp to MSA and Rqst for Judicial Ntc

07/07/2016: JFC Reply To CVIN Opp to MSA and Rqst for Judicial Ntc

Request

06/28/2016: Request

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Set from Trial Setting Conference 5/26/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Set from Trial Setting Conference 5/26/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Set from Trial Setting Conference 5/26/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: J Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc; CVIN, LLC; CVIN, LLC; J. Fletcher Creamer & Son Inc; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; ITC Service Group, Inc., A Nevada Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal (entire action of all parties and all causes of action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Bernard S Kamine New Attorney: Charles L Harris Bar# 146546

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Bernard Kamine New Attorney: Charles L Harris Bar#146546

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketSummary Judgment; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Bernard Kamine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketSummary Judgment; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Matt Dildine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
233 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for J Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc: Counter Payment Receipt # 173854 J Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for J Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • FinancialFinancial: J Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $955.00; Total Payments and Credits $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 23-JAN-2013 by LESPARZA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 23-JAN-2013 by LESPARZA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE173854.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

D ® EILED

KAMINE LAW PC

Dot Ko 8043 - ek i?s Xf;éfitslf (Sjiee;b(s)lllg-el g-‘gg FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT (213) 972-0119; Fax (213) 972-0005 DEFUTY |

Attorneys for J. Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc.

and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.

SS———

— = SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA .

FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO S I =

UNLIMITED JURISDICTION SIS

J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. No. 13 CE CG 00247 DSB Hon. Donald Black, Dept. 502 Plaintiff, |

DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO

V. MOTION TO AMEND CROSS-

| COMPLAINT

CVIN, LLC and DOES 1-300, 1 Hearing Date: ~ December 31, 2015 Defendants. | Time: 3:30 p.m. D|ept.: 502

C]omplaint Filed: January 23,2013

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

The undersigned declares: 1. I am counsel for plaintiff/cross-defendant J. Fletcher Creamer & Son, Inc.

(JFC) in the instant case. As such I have personal knowledge of the following facts and, if called |

as a witness, I could and would competently testify thereto under oath. 2. Defendant/cross-complainant CVIN, LLC (CVIN) contracted with JFC to

place ONLY the conduit and access boxessegments of the project (CVIN's own

forces placed fiber optic cable into the conduit, and connected whatever other equipment was required to get the system up and running). CVIN contracted with ITC to provide inspection | services for many more of the segments of the project than the 6 JFC segments, and, because of |

ITC's termination, it did not provide inspection services on the JFC segments at all times that JFC

was trying to perform its work. Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Amend Cross-complaint

was trying to perform its work. Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Amend Cross-complaint= O 0N N N BREWN e

= O 0N N N BREWN e

D ® PROOF OF SERVICE BY FACSIMILE TRANSMISSION

I am employed in the County of Los Angeles, State of California. I am overparty to the within action. The phone number of the facsimile machine from which this document is being transmitted is (213) 972-0005. Pursuant to the parties’ agreement,

confirmed in writing, to accept service by facsimile transmission, on December 23, 2015. I served

the above document described as:

DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND CROSS-COMPLAINT

on the appropriate parties m this action by transmitting to a facsimile machine maintained by the person on whom it is served at the facsimile machine telephone number last given by that person on a document filed and served in the cause or in the last correspondence received by this office from that person as follows:

Steven D. McGee

Matthew R. Dildine

DOWLING AARON INCORPORATED

8080 North Palm, Third Floor, Fresno, CA 93711

Fax: (559) 432- 4590

Attorneys for CVIN, LLC

The transmission was reported as complete and without error and a copy of the transmission report is attached hereto as proof that the transmission report was properly issued by the transmitting facsimile machine.

I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the

foregoing is true and correct. Executed on December,23, 2015 at Los A geles, California.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ITC Service Group, Inc., A Nevada Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CVIN, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where J FLETCHER CREAMER & SON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant