This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 21:20:42 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 04/07/2014 XXXXX was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Black, Donald, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0968

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Black, Donald

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Morford, Ivan

MItchell, James

Defendants

Mortgage Lender Services Inc

Oliver Jr., Ronald Thomas

James E. Oliver Jr. Insurance Agency Inc

James E. Oliver Jr. Living Trust

Oliver, Gary S

Oliver, Ronald Thomas, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Smith, Myron F.

1284 W. Shaw Ave # 103

Fresno, CA 93711

Johnson, Mark D

Miller, Nathan S.

Defendant Attorneys

Hancock, William F., JR

Christofferson, Jay A.

Laird, Scott D.

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Supplemental Declaration of Gary S. Oliver in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Supplemental Dec of William Hancock, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: Defendants' Objections to the Declaration of Nathan Miller in Support of Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Request for Attorneys Fees [CCP section 664.6]

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Shawn M. Krogh in Support of Ex Parte Application / Motion to Amend the Complaint

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: [Proposed] Order to Continue Trial and all Related Deadlines

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of William F. Hancock, Jr. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Expungement

Appellant Notice Designating Record - CTX Only

Appellant's Notice Designating on Appeal; Comment: Clerk's Transcripts only

Request Filed

Request; Comment: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Reply MMO of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Supplemental Dec of Scott Laird in Support of Defendants' Mtn to Enforce Settlement Agmt & Request for Attys Fees

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Nathan Miller

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Settlement placed on the record.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Conditional Settlement; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Judgment After Conditional Settlement; Party Names: Morford, Ivan; MItchell, James; Mortgage Lender Services Inc; Oliver, Ronald Thomas, JR; James E. Oliver Jr. Insurance Agency Inc; James E. Oliver Jr. Living Trust; Oliver, Gary S; Black, Donald; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Oliver, Ronald Thomas, JR; James E. Oliver Jr. Insurance Agency Inc; James E. Oliver Jr. Living Trust; Oliver, Gary S; Awarded Against:; Morford, Ivan; MItchell, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Mortgage Lender Services Inc; Comment: see minute order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice of Failure to Procure Record on Appeal - Civil- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. Appellant has failed to: Post the required fee for preparation of the clerk's Transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice of Estimate on Clerk's Transcript- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice of Disassociation of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant Notice Designating Record - CTX Only- Appellant's Notice Designating on Appeal; Comment: Clerk's Transcripts only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Notice of Failure to Procure Record on Appeal - Civil- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. Appellant has failed to: Failed to file Appellant's Notice Designating Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Mediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Reinstated- Comment: Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule 2/DCA# F076607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Mediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Suspended- Comment: Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal - Civil- Comment: with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2017
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-46403 Morford, Ivan $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-46076 Morford, Ivan $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00000643 Mark D Johnson $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Counter Payment Receipt # 188880 Morford, Ivan $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • Financial info for Morford, Ivan: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • Financial: Morford, Ivan; Total Financial Assessment $775.00; Total Payments and Credits $775.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

William F. Hancock, Jr., #82292 | L = r \ WILLIAM F. HANCOCK, JR,, \ Co

| A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

470 E. Herndon, Suite 205 NOV 18206 &4 A/ Fresno, California 93720 SUPERIOR COURT. Or LA FORNA Telephone: (559) 437-3780 Facsimile: (559) 437-3778 Attorney for Defendant : MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES, INC. SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA,

IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO UNLIMITED CIVIL DIVISION §

o ok ok U )( IVAN MORFORD AND JAMES Case No. 14CECG00968 /fi /g MITCHELL, Petitioner/Plaintiff, MORTGAGE SERVICE LENDER, INC.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR

vs. NEGLIGENCE; FRAUD, TO SET ASIDE TRUSTEE'S SALE; TO VOID OR MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES, INC. CANCEL TRUSTREE’S DEED UPON RONALD THOMAS OLIVER JR., SALE; QUIET TITLE AND DAMAGES

TRUSTEE OF THE RONALD THOMAS |

OLIVER 2008 LIVING TRUST, JAMES E. OLIVER, JR. INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., JAMES E OLIVER JR. TRUSTEE OF THE - JAMES E OLIVER, JR LIVING TRUST, A a00868 GARY S. OLIVER, AND DOES 1-25 Aowwer Fled

Comes now Defendant MORTGAGE LENDER SEREVICES, INC. and Answers

Respondents/Defendants.

the Verified Complaint on file herein as follows:

1. Answering paragraphs 1-2, 8, 11, 29, 30, 40, 43, 44, 46, 47, 48, 49, 51, 52, 54, 55, and

57 of the complaint, this answering Defendant Denies each and every allegation