This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:34:41 (UTC).

Isabelle Reyes vs. JMY Properties I, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2017 Isabelle Reyes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JMY Properties I, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Dalesandro, Samuel, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0419

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Dalesandro, Samuel

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Natividad, Monica

Reyes, Isabelle

West, Charles

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Overbeck, Shanon

Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincocl Family Living Trust

Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust

JMY Properties, LLC

Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust

JMY Properties I, LLC

UTD January 13, 2004

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JMY Properties, LLC

JMY Properties I, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elder, Margaret

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Bergstrom, Emily D

Taylor, Patrick E.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: JMY Properties I, LLC; Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Overbeck, Shanon; Comment: without prejudice - cross complaint by JMY Properties I, LLC

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Russell Cook

Proof of Service

Proof of Service By Mail; Comment: of JMY Properties I, LL's Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Deft Shanon Overbeck's Answer to Complaint.pdf; Comment: To Original Complaint; 1st Appearance fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons - Cross-Complaint; Summons issued and filed; Comment: To 1st Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: To Complaint; 1st Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service- Sincock Trust DEFECTIVE: serving multiple parties on one POS-010 form

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (Monica Natividad and Charles West dismiss their claims against Defendants Shanon Overbeck, Greg Sincock, and Sharon Sincock ONLY); Party Names: Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Overbeck, Shanon; Comment: Without Prejudice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney:G. Andrew Slater New Attorney: Raymond Meyer Jr. #176235

Case Management Statement Filed

Defts' CMC Statement.pdf

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: 1st Cross- Complaint

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Partial Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL- MONICA NATIVIDAD AND CHARLES WEST DISMISS THEIR CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS SHANON OVERBECK, GREG SINCOCK AND SHARON SINCOCK ONLY

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Reyes, Isabelle; Natividad, Monica; West, Charles; JMY Properties I, LLC; Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Overbeck, Shanon; JMY Properties I, LLC; Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Overbeck, Shanon; Comment: with prejudice - entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: JMY Properties I, LLC; Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Overbeck, Shanon; Comment: without prejudice - cross complaint by JMY Properties I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (Monica Natividad and Charles West dismiss their claims against Defendants Shanon Overbeck, Greg Sincock, and Sharon Sincock ONLY); Party Names: Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Sharon R. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Overbeck, Shanon; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Req by both; est time 5 - 10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial info for Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial: Gregory M. Sincock, Trustee of the Sincock Family Living Trust; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Financial info for JMY Properties I, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-15426 JMY Properties, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Financial info for JMY Properties I, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Financial: JMY Properties I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Financial info for Reyes, Isabelle: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-26362 Reyes, Isabelle $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Financial info for Reyes, Isabelle: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Financial info for Reyes, Isabelle: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-07069 Reyes, Isabelle $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Financial info for Reyes, Isabelle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Financial: Reyes, Isabelle; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less