This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:14:14 (UTC).

Isabella Madrid vs Adventist Medical/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Isabella Madrid filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Adventist Medical/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Smith, Bruce, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3829

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Smith, Bruce

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madrid, Isabella Juliet

Noyola, Yolinda

Defendants

Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al

Bayardo, Carlos Fancisco, Medical Doctor

Omni Anesthesia Associates Inc

Meirabela, P., Registered Nurse

Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor

Adventist Health / Central Valley Network

Sierra Kings Women's Health Center, Inc.

Thorpe, D., Registered Nurse

Adventist Health System/West

Sierra Kings Women's Health Center

Hoover, Rodney

Miguel Angel Cano, M.D.

Freeman, D., Registered Nurse

Sierra Kings Women's Health Center Inc

Bayardo, Carlos Francisco, Medical Doctor

Omni Anesthesia Associates, Inc.

Thorpe, D, Registered Nurse

Guardian Ad Litem

Villasenor, Yolanda

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vanwagenen, Scott A

Davis & Vanwagenen 5703 N. West Ave., Ste 100

Fresno, CA 93711

Moeck, David M.

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Thelen, Dennis R.

Weiss, Andrew R.

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Reinholtz, Jack R.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Rodney F. Hoover, CRNA; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (As to 1st consolidated complaint)

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: MSC rescheduled from 12/14/16 to 12/7/16 @ 1:30 pm in Room 575

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Alan J. Mish in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: 3rd Amended Complaint

Opposition filed

Opposition filed; Comment: to demurrer

Judgment

Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Party Names: Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Awarded Against:; Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: PENDING REVIEW UNTIL HEARING - Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Pending Action

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Notice of Motion

Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication; Comment: and Motion for Summary Judgment As to The Complaint Filed by Isabella Juliet Madrid and The Third Amended Complaint Filed by Yolinda Noyola.

Statement filed

Statement of Undisputed; Comment: Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Defendant Miguel Cano, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment As to The Complaint Filed by Isabella Juliet Madrid and The Third Amended Complaint Filed by Yolinda Noyola.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Designation of Trial Attorney

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Villasenor, Yolanda; Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al; Noyola, Yolinda; Adventist Medical Center-Reedley; Adventist Health System/West; Adventist Health/Central Valley Network; Cano, Miguel Angel, Medical Doctor; Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor; Rodney F. Hoover, CRNA; Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor; Hoover, Rodney; Sierra Kings Women's Health Center; Sierra Kings Women's Health Center, Inc.; Thorpe, D., Registered Nurse; Meirabela, P., Registered Nurse; Freeman, D., Registered Nurse; Miguel Angel Cano, M.D.; Omni Anesthesia Associates Inc; Bayardo, Carlos Fancisco, Medical Doctor; Adventist Health System/West; Adventist Health / Central Valley Network; Bayardo, Carlos Francisco, Medical Doctor; Omni Anesthesia Associates, Inc.; Sierra Kings Women's Health Center; Sierra Kings Women's Health Center Inc; Thorpe, D, Registered Nurse; Meirabela, P, Registered Nurse; Freeman, D., Registered Nurse; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Awarded Against:; Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al; Sierra Kings Women's Health Center; Sierra Kings Women's Health Center, Inc.; Miguel Angel Cano, M.D.; Adventist Health System/West; Adventist Health / Central Valley Network

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Thorpe, D., Registered Nurse; Meirabela, P., Registered Nurse; Freeman, D., Registered Nurse; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sierra Kings Women's Health Center Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Thorpe, D, Registered Nurse; Meirabela, P, Registered Nurse; Freeman, D., Registered Nurse; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Noyola, Yolinda; Adventist Medical Center-Reedley; Adventist Health System/West; Adventist Health/Central Valley Network; Cano, Miguel Angel, Medical Doctor; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor; Comment: defendant in 1st consolidated action with prejudice as to Defendant Amy Shirer MD Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Bayardo, Carlos Fancisco, Medical Doctor; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Party Names: Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Awarded Against:; Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
361 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2015
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al: Counter Payment Receipt # 198579 Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al: Counter Payment Receipt # 188321 Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al: Counter Payment Receipt # 188228 Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Financial: Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al; Total Financial Assessment $765.00; Total Payments and Credits $765.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Madrid, Isabella Juliet: Counter Payment Receipt # 185077 Madrid, Isabella Juliet $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Madrid, Isabella Juliet: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Madrid, Isabella Juliet; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

' PLD-PI001

SHORT TITLE: ISABELLA JULIET MADRID, a minor, by and through her GAL CABE NUMBER: ‘ Yolanda Villasenor vs. Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al.

4. [_] Pleintiff (nams); Is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

PLD-PI-001

SHORTTITLE: ISABELLA JULIET MADRID, a minor, by and through her GAL CASE NUMBER: Yolanda Villasenor vs, Adventist Medical Center-Reedley, et al, . ’

10. The following causes of action are attached and the slatemenits above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causos of aotion gttached):

. [_] Motor Veh!de

Medical Malpractice-Profeasional Negligence

D Intsntional Tort . ' . {__] Products Liabillty . ) . [_] Premises Liabliity , : . [C) Other (specify): L

e QoD

11. Pidniiff has suffered

. [X] wage loss

. ] Ioss of use of property

X hospital and medical expenses X general damage

. ] property damage

(X7 loss of earing capacity . (X7 other damage (specify): ANY AND ALL ECONOMIC AND NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES AS MAY BE

PROVED AND FOR SUCH OTHER RELIEF AS THE COURT DEEMS JUST AND PROPER,

e~papypp

12. [} The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plalntiff to the deceased ere a. [_] Hated in Attachment 12. b, [_] asfollows:

13. The rellef sought in this complaint is within the Jursdiction of this court.

14, Plaintiff prays (or judgment for costs of sult; for such relisf as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. (1) [X] compensatory damages (2) [ punitive damages The amount of damages is (In cases forpomona! Injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)):

(1) £X1 according to proof (2) 1 in the amount of: $

15. [ ] The paragraphs of this complaint alleged on Information and bellef are as follows (specky paragraph numbers);

Date; { 9—"9‘ "‘3 )

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)