This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 05:56:49 (UTC).

Irene A. Heetebry vs. Gordon Irby/UD

Case Summary

On 04/24/2009 Irene A Heetebry filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gordon Irby/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0668

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heetebry, Irene Ann

Defendants

Irby, Gordon

Irby, Desiree

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leifer, William H.

Defendant Attorneys

Irby, Gordon

Irby, Desiree

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2009
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clovis Clerk: P. Nuno Reporter: Nature of Hearing:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 6-3-09 PSN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 05-MAY-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • At Issue Memorandum filed- Comment: At Issue Memorandum filed by Irene A Heeteby requesting 05/20/09 held until . Defendants at issue: Gordon and Desiree Irby. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • Summons & comp - substituted- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Desiree Irby by substituted service, mailed on 04/28/09 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • Summons & comp - personal- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Gordon Irby by personal service on 04/28/09 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to ccr filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed by Gordon and Desiree Irby. cm Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Judge Fain filed. cm by Desiree and Gordon Irby. cm Next date for verfication of eligibility:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to UDDI filed by Gordon Irby . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$215.00 was made on receipt CLCL24191.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 24-APR-2009 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 24-APR-2009 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.