This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:20:09 (UTC).

Invacare Corporation vs G7 Medical Services

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Invacare Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against G7 Medical Services. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3896

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Invacare Corporation

Defendant

G7 Medical Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hemar, Peter S.

2001 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 510

Santa Monica, CA 90403

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Invacare Corporation; Awarded Against:; G7 Medical Services, Inc.; Amount; Damages: $64,411.33; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $6,001.00; Costs: $516.47; Total: $70928.80

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $70,953.80

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $70,953.80

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of (attachment execution ) Filed in the amount of $0.00.

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Document

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Invacare Corporation; Awarded Against:; G7 Medical Services, Inc.; Amount; Damages: $64,411.33; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $6,001.00; Costs: $516.47; Total: $70928.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of (attachment execution ) Filed in the amount of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $70,953.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $70,953.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Case Management Conf Minutes- Comment: Case Management Conference continued to 4/20/15 at 10:00 a.m. in Room 104. Reason: Judgment rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00011176 Law offices Hemar & Associates $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00011174 Law offices Hemar & Associates $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00011170 Law Offices Herman & Associates $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Counter Payment Receipt # 185361 Invacare Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Invacare Corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial: Invacare Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $510.00; Total Payments and Credits $510.00

    Read MoreRead Less