This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:43 (UTC).

In The Matter of Maria G Yudit Figueroa

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 In The Matter of Maria G Yudit Figueroa was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3842

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Figueroa, Maria Guadalupe Yudit

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirkland, Alexia

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Name Change Judgment Filed; Judgment Type: Name Change Judgment Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Name Change Judgment Filed; Judgment Type: Name Change Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Proof of publication filed- Comment: Proof of publication of order to show cause re name change filed. First date of publication 1/1/14. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Minute order Judge Cabrera- Comment: Minute order from Dept 404: Clerk: J Yang Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Order to Show Cause re Name Change Proof of publication submitted in open court. Court grants the petition for order to show cause name change. Order signed. A certified copy of the signed order provided to petitioner. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 06-FEB-2014 by ZEYANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Name change judgment filed- Comment: Judgment change of name signed by Judge Cabrera filed. New name Maria Guadalupe Yudit Figueroa dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Name Change- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration in support of fee waiver civil unlimited filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Clerk filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. le Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Name Change OSC filed- Comment: Order to show cause for change of name filed. Hearing set on Feb 6, 2014 at 9:00 am in dept. 404 . le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Petition for name change filed- Comment: Proposed new name: Maria Guadalupe Yudit Figueroa le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less