This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 12:30:54 (UTC).

In Re: Coordination Proceeding TCP Cases/ JCCP 4435

Case Summary

On 10/23/2015 In Re Coordination Proceeding TCP Cases/ JCCP 4435 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3767

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Clovis

Defendants

Dow Agrosciences LLC

Occidental Chemical Corporation

The Dow Chemical Company

Shell Oil Company

Occidental Petroleum Corporation

Shell Chemical Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boone, Daniel

Defendant Attorneys

Kayhan, Richard D.

Kayhan, Nicholas D.

Henrikson, Brett S.

LEWIS, STEPHEN C

Smith, Jay E.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Clovis - Decl of Renfroe Instruction 2-4.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Tracie J. Renfroe in Support of Defendant Shell Oil Company's Brief Regarding Its Proposed Special Jury Instruction Nos. 2-4 "Harm Defined"

Declaration Filed

Declaration of NDK.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Nicholas D. Kayhan iso The Dow Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Designation of May 6, 1999 Deposition Testimony of Eugene Kenaga Taken in the City of Merced Case

Objection filed

Shell's Objec to depo of H. Lembright 1.20.06.pdf; Comment: Shell Oil Company's Objection to the Use of the January 20, 2006 Deposition of Harold Lembright

Declaration Filed

Decl. of R. Gilhuly OXY MIL No. 3.pdf; Comment: DECLARATION OF R. MORGAN GILHULY IN SUPPORT OF REPLY RE: OCCIDENTALS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF BUTTE COUNTY CONTAMINATION INCIDENT

Notice Filed

Willett, John Designation (08-23-04).pdf; Comment: Notice Filed Plaintiff's Designation of the Deposition Testimony of John C. Willett Taken August 23, 2004

Opposition filed

Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; Comment: Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3

Stipulation Filed

Request Filed; Comment: to continue CMC date. (No action taken, order was not provided)

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: granting ex parte application shortened time of motion for leave to file motion for summary adjudication

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Opposition filed

Opp to Shell Motion for DV Reduced.pdf; Comment: Plaintiff's Opposition to Shell's Directed Verdict Motion

Declaration Filed

Decl of M. Nishikawa In Support of.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Megan R. Nishikawa In Support of Defendant Shell Oil Company's Opposition to Plaintiff City of Clovis' Brief in Support of Trial Exhibit No. 5255-A In Evidence

Declaration Filed

Boone Decl Exhibit 1, Volume 3 RS.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Daniel Boone in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Shell Oil Company's Motion for Nonsuit on Punitive Damages Exhibit 1 Volume 3

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Deposition Designation For Oscar Kasparian.pdf; Comment: Plaintiffs Designation of the Deposition Testimony of Oscar Kasparian, Taken on June 15, 2011, in TCP Cases

Motion in Limine filed

OCCIDENTAL???S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE CONCERNI; Comment: MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE

Proof of Service

Declaration of Service

Coordination Transfer-In

Coordination Transfer-In; Comment: San Bernardino County Case Transferred to Fresno Superior Court pursuant to an order for coordination.

396 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Shell Oil Company; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Occidental Chemical Corporation; Occidental Petroleum Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: The Dow Chemical Company; Dow Agrosciences LLC; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- SKM_95817042715130.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Order Denying Motion for Directed Verdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( minute order and order ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (3/16/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( minute order and Order ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 3/16/17 ) . Parties served: ( )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Order Re: Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
853 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial info for Shell Oil Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-07302 Shell Oil Company $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial info for Shell Oil Company: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Financial info for Shell Oil Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-33506 Shell Oil Company $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Financial info for Shell Oil Company: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Financial info for Shell Oil Company: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00004556 Smith, Jay E. $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Financial info for Shell Oil Company: Transaction Assessment $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Financial: Shell Oil Company; Total Financial Assessment $580.00; Total Payments and Credits $580.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00002556 City; of; Clovis $13207.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Transaction Assessment $13207.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Financial: City of Clovis; Total Financial Assessment $13,207.74; Total Payments and Credits $13,207.74

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.