This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 01:42:45 (UTC).

Hunter Place Apts., LLC vs. Mayra Lopez

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 Hunter Place Apts , LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mayra Lopez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6497

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hunter Place Apts., LLC

Defendant

Lopez, Mayra

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leifer, William H.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Hunter Place Apts., LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 920 W. Griffith Way #110, Fresno, CA 93705.; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Lopez, Mayra; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,165.00; Holdover Damages: $510.00; Attorney Fees: $650.00; Costs: $280.00; Total: $2,605.00; Party Names: Hunter Place Apts., LLC; Lopez, Mayra; All Occupants

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

At Issue Memorandum

At Issue Memorandum

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Mayra Lopez

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Hunter Place Apts., LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 920 W. Griffith Way #110, Fresno, CA 93705.; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Lopez, Mayra; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,165.00; Holdover Damages: $510.00; Attorney Fees: $650.00; Costs: $280.00; Total: $2,605.00; Party Names: Hunter Place Apts., LLC; Lopez, Mayra; All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • At Issue Memorandum- At Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Mayra Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • Financial info for Lopez, Mayra: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00029530 Lopez, Mayra $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Financial info for Lopez, Mayra: Transaction Assessment $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Financial: Lopez, Mayra; Total Financial Assessment $0.40; Total Payments and Credits $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Financial info for Hunter Place Apts., LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00032338 Leifer, William H. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Financial info for Hunter Place Apts., LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for Hunter Place Apts., LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00030477 Leifer, William H. $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Financial info for Hunter Place Apts., LLC: Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial info for Hunter Place Apts., LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00028890 Leifer, William H. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial info for Hunter Place Apts., LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial: Hunter Place Apts., LLC; Total Financial Assessment $266.00; Total Payments and Credits $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leifer, William H.