This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 16:28:52 (UTC).

Hugo Garibo-Espinoza vs. William Kromberg

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 Hugo Garibo-Espinoza filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against William Kromberg. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., McGuire, Rosemary, Tharpe, D Tyler and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0339

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo

Defendants

Kromberg, Ann

Kromberg, William

in her Capacity as Representative of the Estate of James Kromberg

Davis, O.M.

The Testate and Intestate Successors of O.M. Davis

The Testate and Intestate Successors of William Kromberg

All Persons Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title Thereto

Deceased, and all Persons Claiming by or Through, or Under Such Decedent

Believed to be Deceased, and all Persons Claiming by, through or under such person

The Testate and Intestate Successors of James Kromberg

Deceased, and all Persons claiming by, through or under such person

Believed to be Deceased, and all Persons claiming by, through or under such persons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cuttone, Brian K.

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Publication

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference at 1/29/18 in Conference Room 305 at 1:30 PM

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Type of Document: Summons, Complaint and Case Management Conference. By Publication in the Kerman News as to defendants William Kronberg and O.M. Davis. CMC continued to November 20, 2017 at 1:30 PM in Room 305.

Judge's return letter or note

Judge's return letter or note; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Returned: Application and Order Publication and Extension of Time Reason: (1) Why is the Mountain Press most likely to give notice? (2) Who/what is TLO? What effort did they actually make?

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without Judgment

Application and Order filed

Application and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Application and Order for: Publication and Extension of Time

Order Received for Signature

Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint; Comment: Forwarded to Dept:402 on 10/11/17 Order for:publication and extension of time Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action C.C.P. 405.20

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint for Quiet Title

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingDefault Hearing- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Brian Cuttone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Confession of Judgment Certificate by Attorney for Ann Kromberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDeclaration Filed- Confession of Judgment; Comment: Confession of Judgment by Defendant Ann Kromberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Ann Kromberg, in her capacity as Representative of the Estate of James Kromberg in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingOrder Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: PENDING HEARING DATE [Proposed} Judgment Quieting Title

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingRequest for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingRequest for Judical Notice- Request; Comment: In Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Brian K. Cuttone In Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-56956 Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-52262 Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-37911 Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-05774 Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Garibo-Espinoza, Hugo; Total Financial Assessment $656.50; Total Payments and Credits $656.50

    Read MoreRead Less