This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:18:35 (UTC).

Housing Authorities vs Desiree Ann Yanez/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Housing Authorities filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Desiree Ann Yanez/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1539

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Housing Authorities of the City and County of Fresno

Defendant

Yanez, Desiree Ann

Others

Campagne, Justin T.

All Other Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 2/24/14. Clerk's judgment entered. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) Housing Authorities of the City and County of Fresno, California against defendant(s) Desiree Ann Yanez on 1/23/14 for restitution of the premises only. 640 E. California Ave. #104, Fresno, CA 93706, including any and all occupants. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Desiree Ann Yanez on 12/19/13. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/ judgment hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Desiree Ann Yanez. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service by mail filed. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Proof of svc on prejudge claim- Comment: Proof of service on Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed, served on 12/23/13. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 18-DEC-2013 by KCLUGSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Government exemption to payment of filing fees claimed. Event: Government Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by THOBBS.

    Read MoreRead Less