Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 16:57:40 (UTC).

Hilco Receivables, LLC v Diane R Harris cc

Case Summary

On 12/17/2009 Hilco Receivables, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Diane R Harris cc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1944

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hilco Receivables, LLC

Defendant

Harris, Diane R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Desai, Vijay S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL30953.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. PSN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 07/01/10. judgment entered. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 05/11/10 for plaintiff Hilco Receivables, LLC against defendant Diane R Harris in the sum of: Principal: $4,509.11 Interest: $1,247.73 Atty Fees: $800.00 Costs: $343.00 Total: $6,899.84 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Diane R Harris. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants 1-10 filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Vijay S Desai pursuant to ccp 1033(B) filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Vijay S Desai re: interest filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2010
  • Summons & comp - personal- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Diane R Harris by personal service on 03/03/10. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • Proof of service - not served- Comment: Proof of service of civil cover sheet filed - party Diane R Harris not served. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$205.00 was made on receipt CLCL28332.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 22-DEC-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 22-DEC-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 22-DEC-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILCO RECEIVABLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S. DESAI ESQ