This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 13:17:13 (UTC).

Heriberto Avila, JR vs. Citi Mortgage, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2017 Heriberto Avila, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Citi Mortgage, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Cullers, Mark, Gaab, Kimberly, Diaz, Monica and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0459

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Cullers, Mark

Gaab, Kimberly

Diaz, Monica

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avila, Heriberto, JR

Defendants

Citi Mortgage

Mae, Ginnie

Mortgage Electronic Registration System

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A

Citi Mortgage, Inc.

JPMorgan Chase Bank as Trustee for Securitized Trust Ginnie Mae Remic Trust 2007-011 Trust)

United States of America

Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.

Mortagage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Pelletier, Kristina M.

Henderson, Mathew S

Ernce, Lynn Trinka

Eaton, Anthony R

 

Court Documents

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: Second Amended Complaint

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Avila -NOE.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: [Proposed] Order on Motion to Strike Portions of the TAC

Motion filed

Motion; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of the TAC; Memorandum

Judgment Received

Proposed Judgment.pdf; Comment: Proposed Judgment of Dismissal Pending hearing on 8-9-17

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: United States of America's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Citi Mortgage and MERS Demurrer to First Amended Complaint/ Lynn Trinka Ernce Associated Attorney for Defendant Ginnie Mac

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Matthew Henderson Re: Meet and Confer Attempts with Plaintiff Under Code of Civil Procedure, Section 430.41

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Declaration Filed

Declaration of Anthony Eaton ocr.pdf; Comment: DECLARATION OF ANTHONY R. EATON REGARDING MEET AND CONFER PROCESS PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION

Appellant Notice Designating Record on Appeal

Appellant's Notice Designating on Appeal

Judgment Received

Proposed Order; Comment: Forward to: Dept 503 on 10/17/17 of Dismissal forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: United States of America's Disclaimer of Interest; Declaration of Paul St. Laurent, III

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: *PENDING REVIEW UNTIL HEARING*

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Lis Pendens Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Plaintiffs Complaint and Exhibits

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: proof of service of Lis Pendens, Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Plaintiffs Complaint and Exhibits

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Mortgage Electronic Registration System; Mae, Ginnie; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Avila, Heriberto, JR; Comment: Defendant to recover costs and suits PARTIAL JUDGMENT one more defendant still Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; United States of America; Awarded Against:; Avila, Heriberto, JR; Comment: PARTIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A; Awarded Against:; Avila, Heriberto, JR; Comment: PARTIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Citi Mortgage, Inc.; Mortgage Electronic Registration System; Awarded Against:; Avila, Heriberto, JR; Comment: PARTIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Remittitur from the 5th DCA Filed - Civil- Comment: F076675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Order of Dismissal of Appeal after Certification - Civil- Comment: DCA# F076675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice EntryOrderJudgmentDismissalO.pdf; Comment: of Dismissal Of Defendant Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Fee Waiver $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Fee Waiver $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Fee Waiver $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Transaction Assessment $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial info for Avila, Heriberto, JR: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial: Avila, Heriberto, JR; Total Financial Assessment $1,082.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,082.00

    Read MoreRead Less