This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:09 (UTC).

Helen Castaneda vs Tina Ward

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Helen Castaneda filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tina Ward. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Smith, M. Bruce and Smith, Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3830

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Smith, M. Bruce

Smith, Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

Castaneda, Helen Joanne

Jaime, Angelica

Defendants

Ward, Tina Marie

Ward, Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Vanwagenen, Scott A

Davis & Vanwagenen 5703 N. West Ave., Ste 100

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant Attorney

Pepper, Michelle

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Castaneda, Helen Joanne; Castaneda, Helen Joanne; Jaime, Angelica; Ward, Tina Marie; Ward, Steven; Smith, M. Bruce

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Castaneda, Helen Joanne; Castaneda, Helen Joanne; Jaime, Angelica; Ward, Tina Marie; Ward, Steven; Smith, M. Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Dismissal of party- Comment: Request for dismissal of party(s) Angelica Jaime only filed and dismissal entered with prejudice. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Original Type: OSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for ADRS scheduled for 10/30/14. ADR Stipulation filed rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • ADR Stipulation - Mediation- Comment: ADR stipulation filed - parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A Dilling rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Jury requested by Defendant- Comment: rls

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial info for Ward, Steven: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial: Ward, Steven; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial info for Ward, Tina Marie: Counter Payment Receipt # 193228 Ward, Tina Marie $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial info for Ward, Tina Marie: Counter Payment Receipt # 193227 Ward, Tina Marie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial info for Ward, Tina Marie: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial info for Ward, Tina Marie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Financial: Ward, Tina Marie; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Castaneda, Helen Joanne: Counter Payment Receipt # 185078 Castaneda, Helen Joanne $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Castaneda, Helen Joanne: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Castaneda, Helen Joanne; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less