Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 04:01:36 (UTC).

Heather M Johnson vs Brett A Johnson

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Heather M Johnson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brett A Johnson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1338

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Johnson, Heather Mary

Clovis, CA 93611

Respondent

Johnson, Brett Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 06/24/2013 Scanned Date: 10/15/13 lml 10/15/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 10:15 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 6-26-13 CMC. Judgment entered 6-24-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning 6-24-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. box #1 6-24-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: marital status terminates 9-16-13 6-24-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution XXX Legal Separation ___ 6-24-13 ddk Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to:FLEX Shelf for Judgment Review. Date on Shelf 4/24/13. mp 4/24/13

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2013
  • Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense- Comment: Preliminary & Final jlm 04-18-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Proof of service-summons filed- Comment: Proof of service of summons on petition-marriage and blank response ; Notice of Cal setting and FL-107 filed showing service on Brett A Johnson by pers service on 03-15-13 . jlm 04-18-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 12-MAR-2013 by JCOHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE199149.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes th/3-12-13 Event: Pet Disso Marr-no children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial info for Johnson, Heather Mary: Counter Payment Receipt # 199149 Johnson, Heather Mary $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial info for Johnson, Heather Mary: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial: Johnson, Heather Mary; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less