This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:46:45 (UTC).

Hari Sekhon vs. Eutiquio Holguin

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 Hari Sekhon filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Eutiquio Holguin. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7938

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sekhon, Hari

Defendant

Holguin, Eutiquio

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Sekhon, Hari; Holguin, Eutiquio; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Sekhon, Hari; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 150 W. Dakota #102 Fresno CA 93705; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Holguin, Eutiquio

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Previously defaulted on 10/19/16

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Eutiquio Holguin

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: * Judgment not entered Address on Judgment does not match address on complaint. Defective proof of service for all unknown occupants.

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-5

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Sekhon, Hari; Holguin, Eutiquio; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Sekhon, Hari; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 150 W. Dakota #102 Fresno CA 93705; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Holguin, Eutiquio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Previously defaulted on 10/19/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Eutiquio Holguin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment Box #71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession- Comment: Defective: Address on proof does not match address on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment Box 71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Financial info for Sekhon, Hari: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033702 Susan Lanier $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Financial info for Sekhon, Hari: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Financial: Sekhon, Hari; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.