This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 17:22:32 (UTC).

Hannah Birch vs Christopher Birch

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 Hannah Birch filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Christopher Birch. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3398

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Birch, Hannah C-L

Respondent

Birch, Christopher A

Minor

Birch, Gracie L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: Birch, Hannah C-L; Birch, Christopher A; Birch, Gracie L; Comment: Marital Status Terminates 12/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Copies to Box 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Sent judgment to FLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Request to Enter Default- Comment: as to respondent Christopher A Birch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons- Comment: "Amended" Mail and acknowledgment service with return receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default&Judgment to default shelf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Filed Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for Birch, Hannah C-L: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-42702 Birch, Hannah C-L $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial info for Birch, Hannah C-L: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Financial: Birch, Hannah C-L; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.