This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:12:04 (UTC).

Gurmej Dhillon vs. Andrea Hedges

Case Summary

On 09/30/2016 Gurmej Dhillon filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Andrea Hedges. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Dalesandro, Samuel and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7833

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dhillon, Gurmej

Defendants

Hedges, Jeff

Hedges, Andrea

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armo, Lance E.

Defendant Attorney

Lowe, Jerry

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Dhillon, Gurmej; All Occupants; Hedges, Andrea; Hedges, Jeff; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Dhillon, Gurmej; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 267 W. Ridgepoint Dr. Fresno, CA 93711; Awarded Against:; Hedges, Andrea; Hedges, Jeff

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Application for an Order shortening time to hear a motion to Quash Writ of Possession

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Jeff Hedges in support of Motion to Quash Writ of Possession

Ex parte Filed

Ex parte Filed; Comment: For Order Shortening Time

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of mailing

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation Filed; Comment: To Continue Hearing On Motion To Quash Writ Of Possession

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Ex Parte Applicaton, Declaration of Andrea Hedges and Jeff Hedges, Memoradum of Points and Authorities, Proposed Order, Notice of Continued Hearing.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Ex Parte Applicaton, Declaration of Andrea Hedges and Jeff Hedges, Memoradum of Points and Authorities, Proposed Order.

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Efren Diaz Regarding Notice of Ex Parte Application for an order Shortening Time to hear a motion to Quash Writ of Possession

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Other: Doe Defendants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Andrea Hedges

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Dhillon, Gurmej; All Occupants; Hedges, Andrea; Hedges, Jeff; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Dhillon, Gurmej; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 267 W. Ridgepoint Dr. Fresno, CA 93711; Awarded Against:; Hedges, Andrea; Hedges, Jeff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order Granted- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Motion - Quash- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: cont.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Motion - Quash- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: continued from 01-12-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation Filed; Comment: To Continue Hearing On Motion To Quash Writ Of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for Hedges, Jeff: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00039251 Lowe, Jerry $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for Hedges, Jeff: Transaction Assessment $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial: Hedges, Jeff; Total Financial Assessment $371.50; Total Payments and Credits $371.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Financial info for Dhillon, Gurmej: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00040185 Dhillon, Gurmej $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Financial info for Dhillon, Gurmej: Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for Dhillon, Gurmej: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038089 Dhillon, Gurmej $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for Dhillon, Gurmej: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for Dhillon, Gurmej: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033320 Dhillon, Gurmej $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for Dhillon, Gurmej: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial: Dhillon, Gurmej; Total Financial Assessment $266.00; Total Payments and Credits $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.