This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 16:13:38 (UTC).

Guadalupe Campos v Sergio Flores etal udd

Case Summary

On 12/10/2009 Guadalupe Campos filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sergio Flores etal udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1874

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Campos, Guadalupe

Campos, Estela

Defendants

Flores, Sergio

Flores, Socorro

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Altounian, Gregory L.

Defendant Attorneys

Flores, Sergio

Flores, Socorro

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 02/24/10. stipulated judgment entered. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 02/10/10. stipulated judgment entered. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Writ filed wholly unsatisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly unsatisfied. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Stipulated Judgment Entered- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to stipulation of all parties signed by Judge Fain filed Principal: $691.50 Holdover: $396.61 Costs: $504.00 Atty Fees: $750.00 Total: $2,342.11 And for restitution of premises located at 2881 Willow Avenue, #106, Clovis, CA 93612. Lockout stayed to 01/17/10 at midnight. Writ to include All Occupants; defendant waives the right to extend the Sheriff's lockout date based on hardship or for any other reason. Order signed in open court. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clov Clerk: V. Salazar Reporter: 11:20:37 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL28585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only, stayed to 01/17/10 midnight. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCL28249.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for Service of Summons by Posting / Publication signed by Judge Fain on 12/15/09 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Gregory L Altounian filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 10-DEC-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$220.00 was made on receipt CLCL28202.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 10-DEC-2009 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less