This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 10:48:17 (UTC).

Gregory Peters vs. Jaime Schroer

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Gregory Peters filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jaime Schroer. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2482

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peters, Gregory

Defendant

Schroer, Jaime

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Peters, Gregory; Schroer, Jaime; Comment: with prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Lien on proceeds on Judgment/Action/Settlement Obtained by Gregory Peters LIEN CLAIMANT: COURTCALL,LLC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Continued hearing

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: From Gregory Peters

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Mark S Sokolsky Re: personal service complaint of defendant

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Attached cover page of last continuance to copy provided and sent back

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Continuance in court for service.

Motion filed

Motion filed; Comment: Motion for Continuance to remedy questions of fact and law; Judicial Notice of Issues that must be addressed prior to trial in the instant case; Request for Order to transport plaintiff to scheduled hearing in this case.

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: from Gregory Peters

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: - Re: Telephonic Appearance

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Request/Motion to Appear via Video/Telephonically pursuant to Civil Rules Rule 3.670 (No SASE, conformed copies in tickler under P)

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Order on Court Fee Waiver

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Peters, Gregory; Schroer, Jaime; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Lien on proceeds on Judgment/Action/Settlement Obtained by Gregory Peters LIEN CLAIMANT: COURTCALL,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee $40.00 Waiver-Recoverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: Continued hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Letter Received; Comment: From Gregory Peters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: - Re: Telephonic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Request/Motion to Appear via Video/Telephonically pursuant to Civil Rules Rule 3.670 (No SASE, conformed copies in tickler under P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Order on Court Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 10/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Financial info for Peters, Gregory: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Financial: Peters, Gregory; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.